blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1612281

EP1612281 - Methods for assessing patients with acute myeloid leukemia [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  09.05.2014
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.05.2014Refusal of applicationpublished on 11.06.2014  [2014/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Veridex, LLC
33 Technology Dr.
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
[2006/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Raponi, Mitch
1750 Kettner Blvd. 408
San Diego, CA 92101 / US
 [2006/01]
Representative(s)Bullett, Rachel Margaret, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2006/01]Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date05252797.506.05.2005
[2006/01]
Priority number, dateUS20040568635P06.05.2004         Original published format: US 568635 P
[2006/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1612281
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1612281
Date:21.02.2007
[2007/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2007
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68
[2006/48]
CPC:
C12Q1/6886 (EP,KR); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); G01N33/49 (KR); G01N33/57426 (KR);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,KR); C12Q2600/112 (EP,KR); C12Q2600/118 (EP,KR);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,KR); C12Q2600/158 (EP,KR) (-)
Former IPC [2006/43]C12Q1/68, B01J19/00
Former IPC [2006/01]C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Beurteilung von Patienten mit akuter myeloischer Leukämie[2006/01]
English:Methods for assessing patients with acute myeloid leukemia[2006/01]
French:Evaluation de patients souffrant de leucémie myéloïde aiguë[2006/01]
Examination procedure27.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
26.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.04.2013
26.04.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/24]
16.06.2013Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201309   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO03039443  (DEUTSCHES KREBSFORSCH [DE], et al) [X] 27-46 * pages 851,1276; example 4 * [A] 1-22;
 [PX]EP1502962  (VERIDEX LLC [US]) [PX] 1-22,27-46 * claim 1; sequence 2 *;
 [E]EP1611890  (VERIDEX LLC [US]) [E] 1-22,27-46* claim 1; sequence 2 *;
 [DA]  - BULLINGER L ET AL, "USE OF GENE-EXPRESSION PROFILING TO IDENTIFY PROGNOSTIC SUBCLASSES IN ADULT ACUTE MYELOID LEUKEMIA", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, BOSTON, MA, US, (20040415), vol. 350, no. 16, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 1605 - 1616, XP009059431 [DA] 1-22,27-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa031046
 [DA]  - VALK P J M ET AL, "PROGNOSTICALLY USEFUL GENE-EXPRESSION PROFILES IN ACUTE/MYELOID LEUKEMIA", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, BOSTON, MA, US, (20040415), vol. 350, no. 16, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 1617 - 1628, XP009060381 [DA] 1-22,27-46 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa040465
 [PX]  - RAPONI MITCH ET AL, "Identification of molecular predictors of response to ZARNESTRA (TM) (tipifarnib, R115777) in relapsed and refractory acute myeloid leukemia.", BLOOD, & 46TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; DECEMBER 04 -07, 2004, (200411), vol. 104, no. 11, Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 246A, XP009072584 [PX] 1-22,27-46 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.