Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1612707

EP1612707 - Method of collecting information for a geographic database for use with a navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.12.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
Kennedyplein 222
5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL
[2016/25]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
NAVTEQ B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Navteq North America, LLC
425 West Randolph Street
Chicago, IL 60606 / US
Former [2006/01]For all designated states
Navteq North America, LLC
222 Merchandise Mart Plaza - Suite 900
Chicago IL 60654 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Borak, Jason M.
4200 Bunker Hill Drive
Algonquin, IL 60102 / US
 [2006/01]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2006/01]Palmer, Jonathan R.
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date05254076.229.06.2005
[2006/01]
Priority number, dateUS2004088081630.06.2004         Original published format: US 880816
[2006/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1612707
Date:04.01.2006
Language:EN
[2006/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1612707
Date:12.11.2008
[2008/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32, G06F16/29
[2019/52]
Former International [2008/46]G06F17/30, G01C21/32
Former International [2006/01]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Informationssammlung für eine geographische Datenbank zur Verwendung in einem Navigationssystem[2006/01]
English:Method of collecting information for a geographic database for use with a navigation system[2006/01]
French:Procédé de collecte d'informations pour une base de données géographique à l'emploi dans un système de navigation[2006/01]
Examination procedure15.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/05]
12.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
23.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
25.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0227272  (MAYS MICHAEL F [US]) [X] 1-7,9,11-19,20-24,8,10 * page 1, paragraphs 1,4 - page 3, paragraphs 2,3; figure 2 * * page 6, lines 12-38 - page 7, paragraph 2 *;
 [X]EP0406946  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-7,9,11-19,20-24,8-10 * column 2, paragraphs 1-3 - column 4, paragraph 2; figure 3 *;
 [X]US6199014  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [X] 1-19,20-24 * column 6, lines 27-34,47-67 - column 7, lines 1-8; figure 4 *;
 [X]EP1024347  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-7,9-19,20-24 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0020] , [0038] , [0040] , [0043] - [0045]; figure 5 *;
 [X]WO02063243  (HUCKLE NEIL [GB]) [X] 1-7,11-19,20-24 * page 1, lines 30,31 - page 2, lines 1-10 * * page 3, paragraphs 5,8 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 1 *;
 [X]EP0867690  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-19,20-24 * page 1, lines 15-58 - page 2, lines 1-13 * * page 14, lines 50-58 *