Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1764844

EP1764844 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2007/12]Piezoelectric actuator
[2016/25]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Change - classificationpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016Change - inventorpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016Change - German titlepublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016Change - English titlepublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
20.05.2016Change - French titlepublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[2016/25]
Former [2007/12]For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
PO Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bosch, Russell
12152 Hoisington Road
Gaines, Michigan 48436 / US
02 / Cooke, Michael
52 Burnt Oak Terrace
Gillingham Kent, ME7 1DR / GB
03 / Goat, Christopher
The Walnut Tree
North Meadow Offham, Kent / GB
 [2007/12]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB , et al
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/25]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR , et al
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2013/51]Hopley, Joanne Selina , et al
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London
EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2012/09]Holmes, Derek Malcolm , et al
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2008/38]Gregory, John David Charles , et al
Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham
Kent ME8 0RU / GB
Former [2008/15]Gregory, John David Charles , et al
Delphi Diesel Systems Courteney Road Hoath Way
Gillingham, Kent ME8 0RU / GB
Former [2007/12]Hopley, Joanne Selina , et al
David Keltie Associates, Fleet Place House, 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Application number, filing date05255752.716.09.2005
[2007/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1764844
Date:21.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1764844
Date:24.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1764844
Date:22.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/083
[2016/25]
Former International [2008/29]H01L41/083, // H01L41/24
Former International [2007/12]H01L41/083
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/25]
Former [2007/12]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PIEZOELEKTRISCHER AKTOR[2016/25]
English:PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR[2016/25]
French:ACTIONNEUR PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE[2016/25]
Former [2007/12]Piezoelektrischer Aktor
Former [2007/12]Piezoelectric actuator
Former [2007/12]Actionneur piézo-électrique
Examination procedure03.05.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/24]
11.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.2008Fee for grant paid
07.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08103335.9  / EP1944813
EP08103336.7  / EP1944814
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.09.2009  05.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Epcos AG
St.-Martin-Str. 53
81669 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping - Hermann - Fischer
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Schloßschmidstraße 5
80639 München / DE
 [2015/34]
Former [2009/48]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.2009  05.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Epcos AG
St.-Martin-Str. 53
81669 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping, Wilhelm
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
80339 München / DE
Former [2009/45]
Opponent(s)01  24.09.2009   
Epcos AG
St.-Martin-Str. 53
81669 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Epping, Wilhelm
Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55
D-80339 München / DE
04.11.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.05.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.05.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.09.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.05.2016Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition11.07.2011Appeal received No.  T1589/11
16.09.2011Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
29.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
16.10.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE24.12.2008
CY24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
IT24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
TR24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
HU25.06.2009
GB16.09.2009
IE16.09.2009
LU16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/32]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
IT24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
HU25.06.2009
GB16.09.2009
IE16.09.2009
LU16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/21]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
IT24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
GB16.09.2009
IE16.09.2009
LU16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/15]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
IT24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
GB16.09.2009
IE16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/01]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
GB16.09.2009
IE16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/46]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
GR25.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
IE16.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/39]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
IE16.09.2009
FR30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2009/45]BE24.12.2008
CZ24.12.2008
EE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
RO24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
SK24.12.2008
BG24.03.2009
SE24.03.2009
ES04.04.2009
IS24.04.2009
PT25.05.2009
Former [2009/32]BE24.12.2008
FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
Former [2009/27]FI24.12.2008
LT24.12.2008
LV24.12.2008
NL24.12.2008
PL24.12.2008
SI24.12.2008
Former [2009/21]LT24.12.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03105246  (PI CERAMIC GMBH KERAMISCHE TECHNOLOGIEN UND BAUELEMENTE; HEINZMANN, AS) [X] 1-3 * page 2, lines 1-13 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 9 * * page 12, lines 20-24; figure 4a *;
 [A]WO0101499  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraphs 3,4; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE19704389  (FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V.,) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 46-54 *;
 [A]EP1204152  (CERAMTEC AG INNOVATIVE CERAMIC ENGINEERING) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] *;
 [X]EP0479328  (NEC CORPORATION) [X] 1,8,9,13,14,21 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 15 * * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 4 * * figure 8 *;
 [X]US4903166  (GALVAGNI ET AL) [X] 1,8,9,13-15,21 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, lines 51-56 * * figures 2-4 *;
 [A]WO2004077583  (EPCOS AG; RAGOSSNIG, HEINZ; RAGOSSNIG, SIGRID) [A] 1,8,21 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]JP2001102646  ;
 [A]JPH10241993
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001102646 A 20010413 (TOKIN CERAMICS CORP) [A] 5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10241993 A 19980911 (TOKIN CORP) [A] 5 * abstract *
OppositionWO2004077583
 WO2006042791
 US2006238073
 US2006055288
    - BOARO, VOHS, GORTE, "Synthesis of Highly Poraous Yttria-Stabilized Zirconia by Tape-Casting Methods", Journal Am. Ceram. Soc., (2003), vol. 86, pages 395 - 400