Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1764844 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1764844



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 779
01.06.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
27.05.2016 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.05.2016 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
10.05.2016 French translation of claims Opposition 2
10.05.2016 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
11.02.2016 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
25.01.2016 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
16.12.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
15.12.2015 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 18
09.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.11.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 29
05.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.11.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.10.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
16.10.2015 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 10
25.09.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
25.09.2015 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
04.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Claims Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Claims Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Claims Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Claims Appeal 1
28.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
25.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
25.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.08.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 3
20.08.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
18.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.08.2015 Invitation to file an authorisation Appeal 1
14.08.2015 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
14.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.08.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
12.08.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
12.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.08.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 1
06.08.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
21.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
14.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 2
01.07.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
26.06.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.06.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.06.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.06.2015 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 14
19.06.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
26.01.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
16.12.2014 Document concerning representation Appeal 2
22.11.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
13.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
24.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
04.04.2013 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.10.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
27.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 1
25.01.2012 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Appeal 1
25.01.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
25.01.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.01.2012 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
24.01.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
24.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.01.2012 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
20.01.2012 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
20.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.01.2012 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
19.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.01.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 9
05.10.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
22.09.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.09.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
16.09.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
21.07.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
11.07.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
14.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.05.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
06.05.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
06.05.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 20
06.05.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.05.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
03.05.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.05.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
03.05.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
03.05.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.04.2011 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 4
06.04.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.04.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
31.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
30.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
15.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.03.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.03.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
07.03.2011 Claims Opposition 2
07.03.2011 Description Opposition 1
07.03.2011 Description Opposition 1
07.03.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.03.2011 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 5
07.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
07.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.03.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.02.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.02.2011 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
22.11.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
22.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.05.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
24.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
04.11.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.11.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
16.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
02.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.09.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 33
24.09.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.09.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 18
24.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
24.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 23
24.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
24.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
27.11.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2008 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
11.11.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.11.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.11.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.08.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.08.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.08.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
13.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
10.03.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
10.03.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.02.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
14.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
14.01.2008 Description Search / examination 10
14.01.2008 Description Search / examination 11
14.01.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
10.01.2008 Description Search / examination 10
10.01.2008 Description Search / examination 11
10.01.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.09.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.09.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.06.2007 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2007 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.05.2007 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
03.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
03.05.2007 Description Search / examination 14
03.05.2007 Description Search / examination 14
17.04.2007 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.03.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.02.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.07.2006 Drawings Search / examination 10
27.07.2006 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
30.05.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.05.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 5
30.05.2006 European search report Search / examination 5
01.03.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
27.02.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
29.10.2005 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2005 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.09.2005 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.09.2005 Claims Search / examination 6
16.09.2005 Description Search / examination 16
16.09.2005 Drawings Search / examination 10
16.09.2005 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7