Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1671759

EP1671759 - Robot controller and robot control method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi
Hyogo-ken / JP
[2006/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Kubota, Tetsuya
2-4-22-402, Takamaru
Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Naoyuki
662-1, Tomisawa
Takebe-cho
Mitsu-gun Okayama-ken / JP
03 / Fujimori, Jun
3-5-34-1303, Shirogayama
Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Nishimura, Tetsuhiko
1-19-14, Akuro
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
 [2013/04]
Former [2006/25]01 / Kubota, Tetsuya
2-4-22-402, Takamaru Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Matsumoto, Naoyuki
662-1, Tomisawa Takebe-cho
Mitsu-gun Okayama-ken / JP
03 / Fujimori, Jun
3-5-34-1303, Shirogayama Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
04 / Nishimura, Tetsuhiko
1-19-14, Akuro
Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/19]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2013/04]Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2006/25]Charlton, Peter John
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date05257568.508.12.2005
[2006/25]
Priority number, dateJP2004035595408.12.2004         Original published format: JP 2004355954
[2006/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1671759
Date:21.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1671759
Date:15.04.2009
[2009/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1671759
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:B25J9/16
[2006/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/25]
TitleGerman:Robotersteuerung und Verfahren zur Robotersteuerung[2006/25]
English:Robot controller and robot control method[2006/25]
French:Commande de robot et méthode de commande de robot[2006/25]
Examination procedure04.01.2006Examination requested  [2006/25]
10.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.2012Fee for grant paid
24.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  19.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 02  23.10.2013  20.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
KUKA Roboter GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
 [2017/50]
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013  19.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  23.10.2013  20.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
KUKA Roboter GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/50]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Sporer, Gerhard
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  23.10.2013   
KUKA Roboter GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
86165 Augsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Schlotter, Alexander Carolus Paul
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7
80331 München / DE
Former [2013/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.10.2013   
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Sporer, Gerhard
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
03.12.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
01.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition04.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0317/16
06.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0317/16
23.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.02.2016Appeal received No.  T0317/16
21.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
19.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.12.2005
AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE08.12.2013
LU08.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
TR23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE08.12.2013
LU08.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
IE08.12.2013
LU08.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/46]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
LU08.12.2013
CH31.12.2013
LI31.12.2013
Former [2014/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
LU08.12.2013
Former [2014/33]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
MC23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CY23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
CZ23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
RO23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
SK23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
DK23.01.2013
EE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
PT23.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
LV23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
FI23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
NL23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
SI23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
GR24.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT23.01.2013
BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
PL23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
ES04.05.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE23.01.2013
LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT23.01.2013
SE23.01.2013
BG23.04.2013
IS23.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT23.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1250986  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1,11 * page 5, paragraph 28 - page 6, paragraph 33; figure 5 * [Y] 2-10;
 [Y]WO0176830  (ABB AB [SE], et al) [Y] 2-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1234641  (YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046] *
by applicantJPS60205713
 JPH02198783
    - TAKANSETSU ROBOTTO KIKOU GOSA HOSEI HOUSHIKI (METHOD OF CORRECTING ERRORS IN ARTICULATED ROBOT MECHANISM, NIPPON KIKAI GAKKAI RONBUN-SHU, (198502), vol. 51, pages 324 - 331
    - TAKANSETSU ROBOTTO KIKOU GOSA HOSEI HOUSHIKI (METHOD OF CORRECTING ERRORS IN ARTICULATED ROBOT MECHANISM, NIPPON KIKAI GAKKAI RONBUN-SHU, (198502), vol. 51