Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1574241

EP1574241 - Traction kite with negative dihedral [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2005/37]Traction kite with negativ dihedral
[2005/50]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2012
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.10.2017New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Forpora Sàrl
75 Parc d'activités
8308 Capellen / LU
[2008/42]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
Diamond White Serviços de Consultoria Lda
Avenida do Infante 50 9004 Funchal
Madeira / PT
Inventor(s)01 / Legaignoux, Dominique
A.P. 05, Paseo de la Costanera
Las Terrenas / DO
02 / Legaignoux, Bruno
A.P. 05, Paseo de la Costanera
Las Terrenas / DO
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2005/37]Blot, Philippe Robert Emile
Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date05290457.001.03.2005
[2005/37]
Priority number, dateFR2004000209401.03.2004         Original published format: FR 0402094
[2005/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1574241
Date:14.09.2005
Language:FR
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1574241
Date:02.05.2012
Language:FR
[2012/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP13.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:A63H27/08, B63B35/79, B64C31/06
[2005/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/37]
TitleGerman:Zugdrachen mit negativer V-Form[2005/37]
English:Traction kite with negative dihedral[2005/50]
French:Aile à dièdre négatif de traction d'une charge[2005/37]
Former [2005/37]Traction kite with negativ dihedral
Examination procedure23.12.2005Observations by third parties
06.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/18]
21.06.2006Observations by third parties
26.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.06.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2007Observations by third parties
20.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2008Observations by third parties
17.09.2008Observations by third parties
25.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2011Date of oral proceedings
10.10.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2012Fee for grant paid
16.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07005414.3  / EP1878659
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.10.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  05.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Minim Law Limited
Sand House
22 Greenwood Street
Altrincham WA14 1RZ / GB
 02  01.02.2013  25.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Boards & More GmbH
Rabach 1
4591 Molln / AT
Opponent's representative
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
 03  21.03.2013  18.04.2013  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
F One SARL
ZAC de la Méditerranée
170 Route de la Foire
34470 Perols / FR
Opponent's representative
Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
 [2015/31]
Former [2014/43]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  05.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Minim Law Limited
Sand House
22 Greenwood Street
Altrincham WA14 1RZ / GB
 02  01.02.2013  06.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boards & More GmbH
Rabach 1
4591 Molln / AT
Opponent's representative
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
 03  21.03.2013  18.04.2013  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
F One SARL
ZAC de la Méditerranée
170 Route de la Foire
34470 Perols / FR
Opponent's representative
Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
Former [2013/21]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  05.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Minim Law Limited
32 Cleveland Road
Hale
Altrincham
WA15 8AY / GB
 02  01.02.2013  06.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boards & More GmbH
Rabach 1
4591 Molln / AT
Opponent's representative
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft, et al
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
 03  21.03.2013  18.04.2013  INTERVENTION ADMISSIBLE
F One SARL
ZAC de la Méditerranée
170 Route de la Foire
34470 Perols / FR
Opponent's representative
Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
Former [2013/19]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  05.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Minim Law Limited
32 Cleveland Road
Hale
Altrincham
WA15 8AY / GB
 02  01.02.2013  06.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boards & More GmbH
Rabach 1
4591 Molln / AT
Opponent's representative
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft, et al
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
 03  21.03.2013  28.03.2013  INTERVENTION
F One SARL
ZAC de la Méditerranée
170 Route de la Foire
34470 Perols / FR
Opponent's representative
Rhein, Alain
Cabinet BREV&SUD
55 Avenue Clément Ader
34170 Castelnau le Lez / FR
Former [2013/11]
Opponent(s)01  25.01.2013  05.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Minim Law Limited
32 Cleveland Road
Hale
Altrincham
WA15 8AY / GB
 02  01.02.2013  06.02.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boards & More GmbH
Rabach 1
4591 Molln / AT
Opponent's representative
Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft, et al
Bavariaring 10
80336 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
25.04.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.08.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.02.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition05.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0906/16
01.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
29.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0906/16
18.10.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:21.06.2007Request for further processing filed
21.06.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.07.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
18.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
21.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200703   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2007
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.03.2005
AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
LU01.03.2013
MC31.03.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
TR02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/47]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
MC31.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
BG02.08.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2013/10]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
CZ02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
RO02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
SK02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2013/09]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
EE02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2013/08]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
DK02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2013/07]AT02.05.2012
CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/51]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
SI02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/49]CY02.05.2012
FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
PL02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
IS02.09.2012
Former [2012/48]FI02.05.2012
LT02.05.2012
SE02.05.2012
Former [2012/47]LT02.05.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US5366182  (ROESELER WILLIAM G [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [A]FR2639247  (VOILE SYSTEME [FR]) [A] 1-16 * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2645116  (VOILE SYSTEME [FR]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE20220025U  (SKYWALK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004004160  (POUCHKAREV ALEXANDER S [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2775655  (FILLION ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2002020784
 US6502789
    - O'Reilly Open Source Convention, "The Camel Goes Kite Surfing", (20010723), URL: http://conferences.oreillynet.com/cs/os2001/view/e_sess/1514, (20080917),
    - Wardley, Andy, "The Camel Goes Kite Surfing - Designing Power Kites Using Perl", (20010726), URL: http://wardley.org/computers/perl/conference/came_kitesurfing/index.html, (20080917),
    - "Tout nouveau, tout bow", KITESURF MAGAZINE, (200512), pages 44 - 45,
    - URL: www.inflatablekite.com, (20051215),
otherUS2002020784
 FR2866859
 EP1878659
 CA2498729
 US2005230556
 US2007187553
    - "Tout nouveau, tout bow", KITESURF, (200512), pages 44 - 45, XP002994101
    - http://www.paraskiflex.com,
    - NORTH KITEBOARDING, "Vegas 04, Toro 04", KATALOG, (2004), page 2 PG-S, XP003022862
    - WARDLEY. A., "The Camel goes Kite surfing", O'REILLY OPEN SOURCE CONVENTION, SAN DIEGO, CA. USA, (20010723), pages 1 - 33, XP003023196