EP1579845 - Cosmetic composition comprising a polyglycerolated silicone elastomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/16] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanji, Mohamed 76 Heman Street Edison, NJ 08837 / US | 02 /
Lu, Shaoxiang 10 Barley Court Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | 03 /
Patel, Dhaval 1005 Edison Glen Ter. Edison, NJ 08837 / US | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/50] | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
Former [2005/39] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 05290625.2 | 22.03.2005 | [2005/39] | Priority number, date | US20040554929P | 22.03.2004 Original published format: US 554929 P | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1579845 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1579845 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579845 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/891, A61Q1/00, A61K8/892, A61K8/894, A61Q1/02 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
A61K8/894 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/892 (EP,US);
A61Q1/00 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/39] | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2005/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung einen polyglyzeriniertes Silikon Elastomer enthaltend | [2016/42] | English: | Cosmetic composition comprising a polyglycerolated silicone elastomer | [2005/39] | French: | Composition cosmétique contenant un élastomère de silicone polyglycérolé | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/39] | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung, einen polyglyzerinierten Silikon Elastomer enthaltend | Examination procedure | 08.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2005 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | DK | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | MC | 19.04.2017 | NL | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 22.03.2005 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
MC | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
DK | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NL | 19.04.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 19.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5208360 (WARD ANDREW H [US], et al) [X] 1* column 4, lines 48-58; claim - *; | [X]EP1213316 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-29 * paragraph [0037]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1327668 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-29 * page 3, lines 20,25 * * page 4, lines 28-30; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO03075864 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,14,27 * claim - *; | [PX]EP1416016 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-29 * example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP1424373 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-29 * example 35; claim - *; | [PX]EP1496080 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [PX] 1-29 * paragraph [0125]; examples 42,44,56,58,59; claim - *; | [E]EP1550687 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-29 * paragraph [0027]; example -; claim - * |