Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1720289

EP1720289 - Method and device for managing signal measurements in a wireless network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For:FR 
Mitsubishi Electric R&D Centre Europe B.V.
Capronilaan 46
1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL
[2009/01]
Former [2006/45]For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  GB  GR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  MC  NL  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8310 / JP
For:FR 
Mitsubishi Electric Information Technology Centre Europe B.V.
Capronilaan 46
1119 NS Schiphol Rijk / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Bonneville, Hervé
Louvigné
35690 Acigne / FR
02 / Jechoux, Bruno
210 avenue Saint Philippe
06410 Biot / FR
 [2006/45]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/36]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2012/11]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2006/45]Loisel, Bertrand
Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date05290959.502.05.2005
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1720289
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1720289
Date:14.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/00
[2011/42]
Former International [2006/45]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Handhaben von Signalmessungen in einem drahtlosen Netz[2011/45]
English:Method and device for managing signal measurements in a wireless network[2006/45]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour diriger des mesures de signal dans un réseau sans fil[2006/45]
Former [2006/45]Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Handhaben von Signalmaßen in einem drahtlosen Netz
Examination procedure11.05.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/16]
21.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2012Fee for grant paid
26.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.10.2011
Opposition(s)17.12.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
20.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.05.2005
AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
TR14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
LU02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG14.06.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
DE01.12.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
TR14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
LU02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG14.06.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
DE01.12.2012
Former [2014/21]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
TR14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG14.06.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
DE01.12.2012
Former [2013/33]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
BG14.06.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
DE01.12.2012
Former [2013/30]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
DE01.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/22]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
ES25.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/21]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GB14.06.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/20]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
IE02.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/11]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
IT14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/08]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
DK14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
NL14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/07]AT14.03.2012
BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/03]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
MC31.05.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
PT16.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
SK14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
CZ14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
PL14.03.2012
RO14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
SI14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
IS14.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
EE14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
SE14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE14.03.2012
CY14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY14.03.2012
FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI14.03.2012
LT14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT14.03.2012
GR15.06.2012
Former [2012/33]LT14.03.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]US2002188723  (CHOI SUNGHYUN ET AL) [X] 1-13 * figures 4, 5a, 5b, 6a *; paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0028] - [0032] *;
 [X]  - IEEE, "IEEE 802.11h : Amendment 5: Spectrum and Transmit Power Management Extensions in the 5 GHz band in Europe", IEEE STD 802.11H, (20031014), page complete, XP002292634 [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [7.3.2] , [07.4] , [11.5] , [11.6] *
 [A]  - J. CARLE, D. SYMPLOT-RYL, "Energy-Efficient Area Monitoring for Sensor Networks", IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, (2004), URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel5/2/28321/01266294.pdf?tp=&arnumber=1266294&isnumber=28321, (20050930), XP002347426 [A] 1-13 * page 46, column L, lines 2-9 *