Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1634624

EP1634624 - Compositions comprising a triazine derivative and an arylalkyl benzoate derivative; Use in cosmetic [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.04.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[2013/47]
Former [2006/11]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Candau, Didier
46, rue de la Martinière
91570 Bievres / FR
 [2006/11]
Representative(s)Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Miszputen, Laurent
L'Oréal D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Former [2006/11]Miszputen, Laurent
L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier
92600 Asnières / FR
Application number, filing date05291121.125.05.2005
[2006/11]
Priority number, dateFR2004005142002.07.2004         Original published format: FR 0451420
[2006/11]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1634624
Date:15.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1634624
Date:08.01.2014
Language:FR
[2014/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61Q17/04, A61K8/37, A61K8/49
[2013/36]
Former International [2006/11]A61Q17/04, A61Q19/04, A61K8/37, A61K8/49, A61Q19/00, A61Q5/00, A61Q1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/11]
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen enthaltend ein Triazinderivat und ein Arylalkylbenzoatederivat; Verwendung in Kosmetik[2006/11]
English:Compositions comprising a triazine derivative and an arylalkyl benzoate derivative; Use in cosmetic[2006/11]
French:Compositions contenant un dérivé de triazine et un dérivé arylalkyl benzoate; utilisation en cosmétique[2006/11]
Examination procedure15.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
14.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.10.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.10.2013Fee for grant paid
09.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.2014   
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20253 Hamburg / DE
 [2014/46]
17.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.04.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.04.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1395/17
21.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
02.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2005
AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU25.05.2005
AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
BE31.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
GR21.02.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/24]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
BG08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
RO08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
IE25.05.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU25.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
LU25.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
SK08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
CZ08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/39]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/37]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
PL08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/36]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
LT08.01.2014
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
PT20.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT20.11.2013
SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/23]SE20.11.2013
IS20.03.2014
Former [2014/22]SE20.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO2005009341  (BERTZ STEVEN H [US], et al) [PX] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [PX]US2005019280  (BERTZ STEVEN H [US], et al) [PX] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO03039510  (SOL GEL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-27 * page 9, line 19 - page 10, line 17 * * page 39, line 19 - line 21 * * page 41, line 5 - line 9 * * example 13 *;
 [Y]US6355264  (GARRISON MARK STEVEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO2005117824
by applicantUS4367390
 EP0863145
 EP0517104
 EP0570838
 EP0796851
 EP0775698
 EP0878469
 EP0933376
 WO2005117824