Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1623729

EP1623729 - Apparatus for continuous mixing of a biologic fluid and a solution in a predetermined ratio [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/06]Apparatus and method for continuous mixing of a biologic fluid and a solution in a predetermined ratio
[2008/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MACO PHARMA
Rue Lorthiois
59420 Mouvaux / FR
[2006/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Behague, Maurice
12 Allée des Violettes Laitière Bleue
59126 Linselles / FR
 [2006/06]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Breese, Pierre
NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2006/06]Breese, Pierre
BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05291584.025.07.2005
[2006/06]
Priority number, dateFR2004005176903.08.2004         Original published format: FR 0451769
[2006/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1623729
Date:08.02.2006
Language:FR
[2006/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1623729
Date:18.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/02, G05D11/13
[2006/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/06]
TitleGerman:Gerät zum kontinuierlichen Mischen eines biologischen Fluids und einer Lösung in einem vorbestimmten Verhältnis[2008/26]
English:Apparatus for continuous mixing of a biologic fluid and a solution in a predetermined ratio[2008/26]
French:Machine de mélange en continue et selon un ratio déterminé d'un fluide biologique et d'une solution[2008/26]
Former [2006/06]Gerät und Verfahren zum kontinuierlichen Mischen eines biologischen Fluids und einer Lösung in einem vorbestimmten Verhältnis
Former [2006/06]Apparatus and method for continuous mixing of a biologic fluid and a solution in a predetermined ratio
Former [2006/06]Machine et procédé de mélange en continue et selon un ratio déterminé d'un fluide biologique et d'une solution
Examination procedure07.12.2005Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
23.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2008Fee for grant paid
26.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.02.2009
CY18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
TR18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU25.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/32]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU25.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
HU19.08.2009
Former [2011/21]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
LU25.07.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2011/15]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
IT18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/52]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
GR19.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2010/12]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
BG18.05.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
MC31.07.2009
Former [2009/51]AT18.02.2009
CZ18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
RO18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SK18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
PT27.07.2009
Former [2009/48]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
EE18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
IE18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT18.02.2009
DK18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Former [2009/45]AT18.02.2009
FI18.02.2009
LV18.02.2009
NL18.02.2009
PL18.02.2009
SI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
ES29.05.2009
IS18.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[DX]EP0583148  (COBE LAB [US]) [DX] 1-5 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 55; figure 4 *;
 [X]US4582598  (BILSTAD ARNOLD C [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 5, line 59 - line 65 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 25; figure 2; claim 1 *;
 [PX]EP1442758  (MACO PHARMA SA [FR]) [PX] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [PXD]EP1442759  (MACO PHARMA SA [FR]) [PXD] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0583148
 EP1442759