blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1640062

EP1640062 - Fixed catalytic bed reactor with by-pass means through the bed and process using it [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/13]Fixed catalytic bed reactor with by-pass means through the bed
[2018/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 25.11.2020  [2020/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IFP Energies nouvelles
1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2017/44]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
Institut Français du Pétrole
1 et 4 Avenue Bois Préau
92852 Rueil Malmaison Cédex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Boyer, Christophe
626, rue de la Brosse
69390 Charly / FR
02 / Koudil, Abdelhakim
9, rue du Garet
69001 Lyon / FR
 [2006/13]
Representative(s)IFP Energies nouvelles
Département Propriété Industrielle
Rond Point de l'échangeur de Solaize
BP3
69360 Solaize / FR
[N/P]
Former [2019/05]IFP Energies nouvelles
Rond-point de l'échangeur de Solaize
BP3
69230 Solaize / FR
Application number, filing date05291929.716.09.2005
[2006/13]
Priority number, dateFR2004001028628.09.2004         Original published format: FR 0410286
[2006/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1640062
Date:29.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1640062
Date:26.04.2006
[2006/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640062
Date:30.01.2019
Language:FR
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2006
ClassificationIPC:B01J8/04
[2006/13]
CPC:
B01J8/0492 (EP,US); B01J8/0278 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   NL [2019/05]
Former [2007/01]DE,  GB,  IT,  NL 
Former [2006/13]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Katalytischer Festbettreaktor mit Bypass mittels durch das Bett und Verfahren mit Verwendung dieser Vorrichtung[2018/39]
English:Fixed catalytic bed reactor with by-pass means through the bed and process using it[2018/39]
French:Réacteur à lit fixe de catalyseur comportant des moyens de dérivation des écoulements à travers le lit et procédé l'utilisant[2018/39]
Former [2006/13]katalytischer Festbettreaktor mit Bypass mittels durch das Bett
Former [2006/13]Fixed catalytic bed reactor with by-pass means through the bed
Former [2006/13]Réacteur à lit fixe de catalyseur comportant des moyens de dérivation des écoulements à travers le lit
Examination procedure12.06.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
25.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2018Fee for grant paid
19.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2013
Opposition(s)31.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
30.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
GB16.09.2019
[2020/48]
Former [2019/46]IT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
Former [2019/40]NL30.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US3498752  (KUO CHI SHENG) [A] 1* figure - *;
 [X]US5939031  (ELLIS EDWARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claim 1 * * abstract * * column 2, line 46 - line 50 * * column 6, line 34 - line 37 * * column 6, line 51 - line 57 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 10 *;
 [A]US2002081249  (GUPTA RAMESH [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantUS3796655
 US5939031
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.