blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1640501

EP1640501 - Spreading device for granular or powder material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.03.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 29.12.2010  [2010/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gendre Fabrication Industrielle SARL
Plateau des Bruyères BP 4
81 400 Blaye Les Mines / FR
[2008/18]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
Rock France SA
Route de Teillet
81000 Albi / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Villeneuve, Jean c/o Novograaf Technologies
Cabinet Ballot 9 rue Claude Chappe
57070 Metz / FR
02 / Lacz, Alexandre c/o Novagraaf Technologies
Cabinet Ballot 9, rue Claude Chappe
57070 Metz / FR
 [2006/13]
Representative(s)Brungard, Yves Francois
Novagraaf Technologies
11, rue Graham Bell
57070 Metz / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/44]Brungard, Yves Francois
Novagraaf Technologies 11 rue Graham Bell
57070 Metz / FR
Former [2006/13]Brungard, Yves Francois
Cabinet Ballot - Novagraaf Technologies, 9, rue Claude Chappe, Metz - Technopôle
57070 Metz / FR
Application number, filing date05292010.527.09.2005
[2006/13]
Priority number, dateFR2004001023027.09.2004         Original published format: FR 0410230
[2006/13]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1640501
Date:29.03.2006
Language:FR
[2006/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1640501
Date:13.09.2006
[2006/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1640501
Date:21.05.2008
Language:FR
[2008/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2006
ClassificationIPC:E01C19/20, A01C15/16
[2006/13]
CPC:
E01C19/2025 (EP); G01F11/24 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/13]
TitleGerman:Streuvorrichtung für körniges oder pulverförmiges Material[2006/13]
English:Spreading device for granular or powder material[2006/13]
French:Dispositif d'épandage de matiere granuleuse ou pulvérulente[2006/13]
Examination procedure12.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/17]
03.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2007Fee for grant paid
23.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
EE21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
TR21.05.2008
BG21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
GR22.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
HU22.11.2008
[2010/52]
Former [2010/39]AT21.05.2008
CY21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
EE21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
TR21.05.2008
BG21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
HU22.11.2008
Former [2009/45]AT21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
EE21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
IT21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
BG21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/24]AT21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
EE21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
BG21.08.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/22]AT21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
EE21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/14]AT21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
RO21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
PT21.10.2008
Former [2009/13]AT21.05.2008
CZ21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
LT21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SK21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
Former [2009/08]AT21.05.2008
DK21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
IE21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
Former [2009/07]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
SE21.08.2008
IS21.09.2008
Former [2009/05]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
IS21.09.2008
Former [2008/50]AT21.05.2008
FI21.05.2008
LV21.05.2008
NL21.05.2008
SI21.05.2008
Former [2008/44]SI21.05.2008
Documents cited:Search[DA]FR718646  (MELIN ATEL) [DA] 1* the whole document *;
 [DA]US3774814  (VIDJAK F) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantFR718646
 US3774814
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.