Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1669279

EP1669279 - Front bonnet provided with electric conductors for a motor vehicle. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 10.10.2012  [2012/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM
19, avenue Jules Carteret
69007 Lyon / FR
[2006/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Guyon, Sébastien
52a rue de la Ville
01460 Montreal la Cluse / FR
02 / Spaak, Marie-Laure
4 rue du Transvaal
69008 Lyon / FR
03 / Vilquin, Gilles
36 rue Paul Verlaine
69100 Villeurbanne / FR
04 / Cheron, Hugues
13 Chemin du Calvaire
01800 Meximieux / FR
 [2006/24]
Representative(s)Remy, Vincent Noel Paul , et al
LLR
11 boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/24]Remy, Vincent Noel Paul , et al
Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date05292656.513.12.2005
[2006/24]
Priority number, dateFR2004001322613.12.2004         Original published format: FR 0413226
[2006/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1669279
Date:14.06.2006
Language:FR
[2006/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1669279
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/10
[2006/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/24]
TitleGerman:Motorhaube mit elektrischen Leitern für ein Kraftfahrzeug[2006/24]
English:Front bonnet provided with electric conductors for a motor vehicle.[2006/24]
French:Capot avant à conducteurs électriques pour véhicule automobile[2007/02]
Former [2006/24]Capot avant à conducteurs éleqtriques pour véhicule automobile
Examination procedure11.12.2006Examination requested  [2007/04]
12.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2008Fee for grant paid
19.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT25.07.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2012/41]
Former [2011/44]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/32]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/15]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
IT25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2010/52]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2010/12]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/51]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/48]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/46]AT25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
Former [2009/45]AT25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SE25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03068584  (FERRARI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7 * figures 1,4 * * page 1, line 11 - page 1, line 14 * * page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 9 * * page 10, line 13 - page 10, line 25 *;
 [A]DE29917502U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [A] 1,3-7 * figure 1 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]DE10026264  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5 * figures 6a,6b,6c,7a,7b,7c; claim 21 * * column 7, paragraph 53 - column 7, paragraph 56 *
ExaminationUS2003141743
by applicantUS2003141743