Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1575181

EP1575181 - A method for coupling a mobile terminal with an adapter in a vehicle. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TCL & Alcatel Mobile Phones Ltd
Rm 904 Tower 1 33 Canton Rd Tsimsha Tsui
Kowloon, Hongkong / CN
[2009/09]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
TCL & Alcatel Mobile Phones Ltd
Rm 904 Tower 1 33 Canton Rd Tsimsha Tsui Kowloon
Hongkong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Codeville, Sébastien
999 Changshow Road, bld 29 Apt 10A
Shanghai 200042 / CN
 [2005/37]
Representative(s)Hervouet-Malbec, Sylvie
Ipsilon
Le Centralis
63, avenue du Général Leclerc
92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/52]Hervouet, Sylvie
Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, avenue Aristide Briand
92163 Antony Cedex / FR
Former [2005/37]Hervouet, Sylvie
Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand
92160 Antony / FR
Application number, filing date05300179.811.03.2005
[2005/37]
Priority number, dateCN20040100691712.03.2004         Original published format: CN200401006917
[2005/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1575181
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1575181
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/60, H04B5/02
[2008/40]
Former International [2005/37]H04B1/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IE,   IT,   PT [2006/22]
Former [2005/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kopplung eines drahtlosen Endgerätes mit einem Adapter in einem Auto.[2005/37]
English:A method for coupling a mobile terminal with an adapter in a vehicle.[2005/37]
French:Méthode pour coupler un terminal mobile avec un adaptateur dans une voiture.[2005/37]
Examination procedure14.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/06]
02.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2009Fee for grant paid
08.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5524044  (TAKEDA MIKIO [JP]) [DX] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US6230031  (BARBER CLIFTON J [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *
 [A]  B. CHOI, J. NHO, H. CHA, T. AHN, S. CHOI., "Design and implementation of low-profile contactless battery charger using planar printed circuit board windings as energy transfer device", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, (200402), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 140 - 147, XP002332886 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * pages 140-141 *