Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1601190

EP1601190 - Image acquisition device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2018Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Digital Video Sud
ZA Pole d'Activites des Milles, 200, rue Jean de Guiramand
13858 Aix en Provence Cedex 03 / FR
[2005/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Novoyan, Aram
Résidence Jean Imbert Chemin des Croix
05200 Embrun / FR
 [2005/48]
Representative(s)Boura, Olivier , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie
Tour Méditerrannée
65 avenue Jules Cantini
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]Domange, Maxime , et al
Cabinet Beau de Lomenie, 232, avenue du Prado
13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR
Application number, filing date05358005.625.05.2005
[2005/48]
Priority number, dateFR2004000581728.05.2004         Original published format: FR 0405817
[2005/48]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1601190
Date:30.11.2005
Language:FR
[2005/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1601190
Date:14.12.2005
[2005/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232
[2005/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/48]
TitleGerman:Bilderfassungsvorrichtung[2005/48]
English:Image acquisition device[2005/48]
French:Dispositif d'acquisition d'images[2005/48]
Examination procedure02.06.2006Examination requested  [2006/31]
25.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2978/18
30.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
07.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
18.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
15.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
17.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201208   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.2012
31.05.201410   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2014
31.05.201612   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2016
31.05.201814   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - THOMSON MULTIMEDIA BROADCAST SOLUTIONS, "LDK 23HS MKII HIGH-SPEED CAMERA SYSTEM", BROCHURE, (20020608), URL: http://www.thomsongrassvalley.com/docs/Brochures/cameras/ldk23/3122-787-34100.pdf, (20050121), XP002314518 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - SILICON IMAGING INC., "SILICON IMAGING MEGACAMERA SI-3170", BROCHURE, (2002), URL: http://www.siliconimaging.com/MegaCamera.pdf, (20050121), XP002314519 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *