EP1733945 - Control system and method for controlling the driving-away manoeuvre in a motor vehicle with a servo-controlled gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states C.R.F. SOCIETA' CONSORTILE PER AZIONI Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | ||
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gianoglio, Renato deceased / IT | 02 /
Del Pin, Dario Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Ellena, Giovanni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 04 /
Fossanetti, Massimo Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 05 /
Lupo, Massimo Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 06 /
Porta, Attilio Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 07 /
Borodani, Pandeli Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
Gianoglio, Renato deceased / IT | ||
02 /
Del Pin, Dario Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
03 /
Ellena, Giovanni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
04 /
Fossanetti, Massimo Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
05 /
Lupo, Massimo Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
06 /
Porta, Attilio Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | |||
07 /
Borodani, Padeli Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Representative(s) | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425431.3 | 17.06.2005 | [2006/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733945 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733945 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/18, B60W50/00 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0031 (EP);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W2510/104 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Title | German: | Steuerung und Steuerungsmethode für das Anfahrmanöver eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit automatisiertem Getriebe | [2007/27] | English: | Control system and method for controlling the driving-away manoeuvre in a motor vehicle with a servo-controlled gearbox | [2006/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande du démarrage d'un véhicule automobile avec une boîte de vitesse à servocommande | [2007/27] |
Former [2006/51] | Steuerung und Steuerungsmethode für das Anfahrmöver eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit automatisiertem Getriebe | ||
Former [2006/51] | Procédé et dispositif de commande du démarrage d'un véhicule automobile avec une transmission automatisée | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 25.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2007 | BE | 24.10.2007 | CH | 24.10.2007 | CY | 24.10.2007 | CZ | 24.10.2007 | DK | 24.10.2007 | EE | 24.10.2007 | FI | 24.10.2007 | LI | 24.10.2007 | LT | 24.10.2007 | NL | 24.10.2007 | PL | 24.10.2007 | RO | 24.10.2007 | SI | 24.10.2007 | SK | 24.10.2007 | TR | 24.10.2007 | BG | 24.01.2008 | GR | 25.01.2008 | IS | 24.02.2008 | PT | 24.03.2008 | HU | 25.04.2008 | IE | 17.06.2008 | LU | 17.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
LU | 17.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
IE | 17.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
EE | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
RO | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
SK | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SI | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LT | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
PL | 24.10.2007 | ||
BG | 24.01.2008 | ||
IS | 24.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03086804 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [A] 1,12* abstract *; | [A]DE10316442 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0906526 |