Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1713759

EP1713759 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ADIPODINITRILE BY HYDROCYANATION OF 1,3-BUTADIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.10.2010
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF SE
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BARTSCH, Michael
Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 38
67433 Neustadt / DE
02 / BAUMANN, Robert
E 7, 23
68159 Mannheim / DE
03 / HADERLEIN, Gerd
Hochgewanne 93a
67269 Grünstadt / DE
04 / FLORES, Miguel, Angel
Acequia 27
E-28300 Aranjuez (Madrid) / ES
05 / JUNGKAMP, Tim
Magnolialaan 19
B-2950 Kapellen / BE
06 / LUYKEN, Hermann
Brüsseler Ring 34
67069 Ludwigshafen / DE
07 / SCHEIDEL, Jens
Büttemer Weg 12
69493 Hirschberg / DE
08 / SIEGEL, Wolfgang
Goethestr.34b
67117 Limburgerhof / DE
 [2006/43]
Representative(s)Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Féaux de Lacroix, Stefan
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date05701177.726.01.2005
[2006/43]
WO2005EP00717
Priority number, dateDE2004100468229.01.2004         Original published format: DE102004004682
[2006/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005073167
Date:11.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1713759
Date:25.10.2006
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005
[2006/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1713759
Date:03.11.2010
Language:DE
[2010/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07C253/10, C07C253/30
[2006/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/43]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ADIPODINITRIL DURCH HYDROCYANIERUNG VON 1,3-BUTADIEN[2006/43]
English:METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ADIPODINITRILE BY HYDROCYANATION OF 1,3-BUTADIENE[2006/43]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ADIPODINITRILE PAR HYDROCYANURATION DE 1,3-BUTADIENE[2006/43]
Entry into regional phase29.08.2006National basic fee paid 
29.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
29.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
25.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2010Fee for grant paid
22.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.08.2011  10.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Opponent's representative
Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2015/16]
Former [2011/36]
Opponent(s)01  03.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
INVISTA Technologies S.à.r.l.
Zweigniederlassung St. Gallen Pestalozzistrasse 2
9000 St. Gallen / CH
Opponent's representative
Kirsch, Susan Edith
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
08.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.03.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
24.01.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.01.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition28.03.2014Appeal received No.  T0777/14
03.06.2014Statement of grounds filed
16.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HU03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
AT26.01.2011
LU26.01.2011
ES27.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GB03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
BE31.01.2017
NL01.02.2017
DE01.08.2017
[2018/01]
Former [2017/36]CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HU03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
AT26.01.2011
LU26.01.2011
ES27.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GB03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
BE31.01.2017
Former [2013/45]CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
HU03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
AT26.01.2011
LU26.01.2011
ES27.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GB03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2013/44]CY03.11.2010
CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
IT03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
TR03.11.2010
AT26.01.2011
LU26.01.2011
ES27.01.2011
CH31.01.2011
LI31.01.2011
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GB03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/38]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
RO03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
MC31.01.2011
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/36]CZ03.11.2010
DK03.11.2010
EE03.11.2010
FI03.11.2010
IE03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
PL03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
SK03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/29]FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
SE03.11.2010
SI03.11.2010
BG03.02.2011
GR04.02.2011
IS03.03.2011
PT03.03.2011
Former [2011/23]FI03.11.2010
LT03.11.2010
IS03.03.2011
Former [2011/19]LT03.11.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03011457  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 15, line 16 - line 44; examples 1-3,7-9,16-18; claims 22-24 *;
 [X]US6242633  (FISCHER JAKOB [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 14, line 1 - line 23; examples 8,11,12 *;
 [Y]US2001014647  (FISCHER JAKOB [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 8-24; claims 8,13,14 *;
 [Y]FR2830530  (RHODIA POLYAMIDE INTERMEDIATES [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * page 11, line 28 - line 33; example . *;
 [Y]DE10046025  (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 10, line 46 - page 12, line 8; claims 4,8,9 *;
 [Y]US3496215  (DRINKARD WILLIAM C, et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples I,VII-XII *;
 [Y]WO0230854  (RHODIA POLYAMIDE INTERMEDIATES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 1-6 *;
 [Y]WO02053527  (RHODIA POLYAMIDE INTERMEDIATES [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * examples 1-10 *;
 [Y]US6169198  (FISCHER JAKOB [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claims 15-17 *;
 [A]US3850973  (SEIDEL W, et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - MONTGOMERY, J., Science of Synthesis, STUTTGART, GOERG THIEME VERLAG, (2001), 1, XP009048800 [A] 1-13 * page 11 - page 62, paragraphs 1.1.1,1.1.1.6,1.1.4.5 *
 [A]  - W. C. SEIDEL, C. A. TOLMAN, ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (1983), vol. 415, pages 201 - 211, XP009048790 [A] 1-13 * pages 201,202, - pages 206,218 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1749-6632.1983.tb47360.x
 [A]  - TOLMAN C A ET AL, "CATALYTIC HYDROCYANATION OF OLEFINS BY NICKEL(O) PHOSPHITE COMPLEXES-EFFECTS OF LEWIS ACIDS", ORGANOMETALLICS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1984), vol. 3, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 33 - 38, XP001005579 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om00079a008
by applicantUS6127567
 US6171996
 US6380421
 US3496217
 US3496218
 US4774353
 US3773809
 US4874884
 US5693843
 DE102004004671
 DE10351002
 DE102004004683
    - Kirk-Othmer, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1996), vol. 20, pages 1040 - 1055
    - Kirk-Othmer, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1979), vol. 7, pages 870 - 881