Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1713760 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1713760



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1198
21.02.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
21.02.2019 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
18.02.2019 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
01.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.02.2019 English translation of the claims Opposition 2
01.02.2019 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
01.02.2019 French translation of claims Opposition 3
28.12.2018 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
21.12.2018 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
29.10.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
29.10.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
29.10.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
17.10.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
18.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
18.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.07.2018 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 37
02.07.2018 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 3
02.07.2018 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.07.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.07.2018 Means of redress Opposition 2
23.02.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 45
16.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Opposition 8
16.02.2018 Description Opposition 34
16.02.2018 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
15.01.2018 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 1
15.01.2018 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
15.01.2018 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
22.11.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.11.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
21.11.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
14.03.2016 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
03.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
03.03.2016 Submission concerning change of applicant's address Search / examination 3
01.03.2016 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
01.03.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
05.02.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 21
02.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.02.2016 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
11.01.2016 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
22.12.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 2
03.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.11.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 1
30.11.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
24.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.11.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.11.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
06.11.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.03.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.03.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Appeal 1
06.06.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
23.07.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.07.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
04.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.12.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Claims Appeal 2
21.12.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 9
19.12.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 37
24.10.2011 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 2
21.10.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.10.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
22.08.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
10.06.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.06.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.06.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 48
30.05.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
30.05.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
30.05.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 37
27.05.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 109
11.04.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
29.03.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
28.03.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.03.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.03.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.2011 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.03.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.03.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
28.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
20.01.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 22
20.01.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
20.01.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
20.01.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Means of redress Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2011 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 9
29.11.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
24.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Claims Opposition 2
22.11.2010 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
22.11.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.10.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
21.10.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.10.2010 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.10.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.09.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.09.2010 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.08.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.08.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.08.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
06.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.08.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.08.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.07.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
23.07.2010 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
19.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.07.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
08.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.03.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
10.02.2010 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2010 Claims Opposition 2
10.02.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
09.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
09.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 2
09.02.2010 Claims Opposition 2
09.02.2010 Claims Opposition 2
09.02.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
02.12.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.11.2009 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
30.07.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
30.07.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.05.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.04.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 72
01.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
01.04.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
01.04.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
30.03.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.03.2009 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 22
30.03.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
30.03.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 2
30.03.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
30.03.2009 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
14.01.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.05.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.05.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.05.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
14.02.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.02.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.02.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.02.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
01.02.2008 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
19.01.2008 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 3
09.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2007 Description Search / examination 2
09.05.2007 Description Search / examination 2
09.05.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.02.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.02.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.10.2006 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.09.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
09.08.2006 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
09.08.2006 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
30.06.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
30.06.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
19.06.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
25.04.2006 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.04.2006 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
25.04.2006 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2006 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
30.01.2006 Notification of defects in the demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
16.01.2006 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.01.2006 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
22.12.2005 Authorisation Search / examination 3
18.11.2005 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
18.11.2005 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.11.2005 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
18.11.2005 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
30.08.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
11.08.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.08.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
11.08.2005 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 46
10.02.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.02.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 3
10.02.2005 Description International Searching Authority 40
10.02.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 1