Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1846116 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1846116



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 746
10.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.10.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2015 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
07.10.2015 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
05.10.2015 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
01.10.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
29.09.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.09.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.09.2015 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
24.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.09.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
26.06.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.06.2015 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
26.06.2015 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 4
28.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.05.2015 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
15.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
29.04.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
23.04.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
23.04.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
23.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
23.04.2015 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.04.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
30.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.03.2015 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
23.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
02.02.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.09.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.09.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 15
06.09.2013 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.09.2013 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
06.09.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
06.09.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
06.09.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 42
19.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
26.11.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.11.2012 Reply to appeal Appeal 14
19.07.2012 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.06.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Claims Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Claims Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Claims Appeal 3
20.06.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.06.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
20.06.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.06.2012 Non-scannable object Appeal 7
20.06.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
26.04.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
16.04.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
11.04.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
25.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.02.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
10.02.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
10.02.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
10.02.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 6
10.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.02.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.01.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.12.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 79
16.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.12.2011 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 10
16.12.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
16.12.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
16.12.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.11.2011 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Claims Opposition 3
07.11.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
08.07.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.07.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.06.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
13.08.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.08.2010 Claims Opposition 3
06.08.2010 Claims Opposition 3
06.08.2010 Claims Opposition 3
06.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
06.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.08.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.08.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 12
11.06.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.06.2010 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
29.01.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.01.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.01.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.12.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.12.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.12.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.12.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
16.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.02.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.02.2009 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.02.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.02.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
02.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
13.05.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2008 Description Search / examination 3
13.05.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.01.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.09.2007 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
27.08.2007 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.07.2007 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
26.06.2007 Annex Search / examination 15
26.06.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.06.2007 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
21.05.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.07.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.07.2006 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.07.2006 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 17
08.02.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
08.02.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 3
08.02.2005 Description International Searching Authority 8
08.02.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 4