Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1644259

EP1644259 - PACKAGING FOR PULVERULENT BABY FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2006/15]PACKAGING FOR PULVERULENT MATERIAL
[2013/01]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
02.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Inventor(s)01 / CRAWFORD, Karen, Rita
Elmlea House, Railway Lane
Wellow, Bath BA2 8QC / GB
02 / LUTTIK, Nicolaas
Wilgeboom 8a
NL-4101 WL Culemborg / NL
 [2006/15]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2013/28]
Former [2013/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2006/15]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date05704618.707.02.2005
[2006/15]
WO2005NL00089
Priority number, dateEP2004007536505.02.2004         Original published format: EP 04075365
[2006/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005075314
Date:18.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1644259
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005
[2006/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1644259
Date:29.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:B65D51/24, B65D81/20, B65D25/28, B65D51/20
[2006/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/15]
TitleGerman:VERPACKUNG FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGE BABYNAHRUNG[2013/01]
English:PACKAGING FOR PULVERULENT BABY FOOD[2013/01]
French:EMBALLAGE POUR ALIMENTS EN POUDRE POUR BÉBÉS[2013/01]
Former [2006/15]VERPACKUNG FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGES MATERIAL
Former [2006/15]PACKAGING FOR PULVERULENT MATERIAL
Former [2006/15]EMBALLAGE POUR MATIERE PULVERULENTE
Entry into regional phase19.12.2005National basic fee paid 
19.12.2005Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2005Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2005Examination requested  [2006/15]
20.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
07.12.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2013Fee for grant paid
18.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09158703.0  / EP2105387
EP14176096.7  / EP2810893
EP16193637.2  / EP3144240
EP19183416.7
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2006
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Valea AB, et al
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
 [2017/33]
Former [2017/27]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Romare, Laila Anette, et al
Valea AB
Lilla Bommen 3A
Box 1098
SE-405 23 Göteborg / SE
Former [2017/10]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco GmbH, et al
Bayerstrasse 83
80335 München / DE
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Zacco Sweden AB, et al
P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/15]
Opponent(s)01  27.02.2014  05.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Å&R Carton Lund AB
Box 177
221 00 Lund / SE
Opponent's representative
Friberg, Ingvar, et al
Zacco Sweden AB
P.O. Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
04.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.10.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition02.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0288/17
12.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0288/17
29.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:17.11.2006Request for further processing filed
17.11.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.11.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
21.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.02.2005
AT29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU07.02.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/31]AT29.05.2013
CY29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU07.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
MC29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
LU07.02.2014
Former [2014/11]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
RO29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT29.05.2013
CZ29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
SK29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT29.05.2013
DK29.05.2013
EE29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
BG29.08.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT29.05.2013
FI29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
SI29.05.2013
GR30.08.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.05.2013
LT29.05.2013
IS29.09.2013
PT30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT29.05.2013
PT30.09.2013
Cited inInternational search[IY]FR2747107  (BOIS JACQUES [FR]) [I] 1-3,7 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,9,13-15;
 [I]US5705212  (ATKINSON PATRICK J [US]) [I] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [YA]CH671749  (ALFATECHNIC AG) [Y] 6,9,13-15 * page 2, column R, line 38 - page 3, column L, line 36; figures 1-4 * [A] 3;
 [YA]EP1157936  (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2-4,10,11 * [A] 3;
 [A]DE19815364  (GRT VERPACKUNGEN AUS KUNSTSTOF [DE]) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6604645  (VAUPOTIC VLADIMIR [AU]) [A] 1,2,7 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JP2001019006  ;
 [A]CH381606  (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,7 * page 1, line 39 - page 2, line 7; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]FR1338551  (RIGOLOT HENRI CLAUDE) [A] 1,7 * page 2, column L, line 23 - line 43; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]GB2250271  (ROBINSON & SONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,9 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 28; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2000344243  ;
 [A]US5219087  (CHRISTENSSON LARS [SE]) [A] 1,3,6,9,13-15 * column 5, line 3 - line 49; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]WO03022703  (HUHTAMAKI UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,3,6,9,13-15 * page 13, line 29 - page 16, line 10; figures 31-41 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010508), vol. 2000, no. 16, & JP2001019006 A 20010123 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-5,7,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000344243 A 20001212 (ASUBERU KK) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0312513
 FR2490191
 CH293986
 CH453117
 GB2086834