EP1701622 - METHOD FOR WASHING CARCASS, MEAT, OR MEAT PRODUCTS WITH MEDIUM CHAIN PEROXYCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul, MN 55102-2233 / US | [2017/14] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB INC. Ecolab Center 370 North Wabasha Street St. Paul MN 55102-2233 / US | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states ECOLAB, INC. Ecolab Center, 370 Wabasha Street Saint Paul, MN 55102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAN, Victor, F. 1410 Carling Drive, Apt. 207 St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | 02 /
MAGNUSON, Joshua, P. 258 Syndicate Steret S. St.Paul, MN 55105 / US | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/52] | Godemeyer Blum Lenze - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2006/38] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Polypatent Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704975.1 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/38] | WO2005US00149 | Priority number, date | US20040754436 | 09.01.2004 Original published format: US 754436 | US20050029235 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: US 29235 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070238 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701622 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701622 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3508, A23B4/20, A23B4/24, A23B4/30 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
A23B4/20 (EP);
A23B4/24 (EP);
A23B4/30 (EP);
A23L3/3508 (EP);
Y02A40/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2006/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WASCHEN VON KARKASSEN, FLEISCH ODER ROHEN FLEISCHPRODUKTEN MIT MITTELKETTIGEN PEROXYCARBONSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2006/38] | English: | METHOD FOR WASHING CARCASS, MEAT, OR MEAT PRODUCTS WITH MEDIUM CHAIN PEROXYCARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOSITIONS | [2006/38] | French: | METHODE DE LAVAGE DE CARCASSE, DE VIANDE OU DE PRODUITS CARNES AVEC DES COMPOSITIONS D'ACIDE PEROXYCARBOXYLIQUE A CHAINE MOYENNE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12156637.6 / EP2478780 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2005 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | DK | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | ES | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | IT | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | NL | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RO | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | TR | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | GB | 05.01.2018 | IE | 05.01.2018 | LU | 05.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 05.01.2005 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
TR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
GB | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
IT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RO | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
DK | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
ES | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
NL | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 05.04.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US6010729 (GUTZMANN TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [DX] 1,8-30,32-38,46-55; | [X]EP0985349 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [X] 1,8-30,32-38,46-55 * page 8 - page 9; example 1; claims 25,27 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] , [0079] *; | [X]WO02054866 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [X] 1,8,9,14-30,32-41,43,44,46-48,55 * page 12, line 10 - page 13, line 6; example -; claim - * * page 20, line 18 - line 22 * * page 22, line 16 - line 26 * * page 25, line 15 - page 34, line 19 *; | [X]WO02060280 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [X] 1,8-22,25-30,32-38,46-48,55 * page 30, line 27 - page 31, line 3 * * page 42, line 9 - page 44, line 20 * * page 31, line 18 - line 27 * * page 44, line 24 - line 25 *; | [PA]WO2004043162 (NOLEN GARY [US], et al) [PA] 2-4,39-44* claim - * |