Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1709546

EP1709546 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING A PTT SESSION INITIATION USING AN IP-BASED PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.07.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.09.2010  [2010/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road, A Corporation of the State of Delaware
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2006/41]
Inventor(s)01 / CROCKER, Ronald, T.
3N800 Meadowridge Circle
St. Charles, Illinois 60175 / US
02 / HART, Thomas, B.
936 Pember Circle
West Dundee, Illinois 60118 / US
03 / HORVATH, Robert
2570 N. Jade Avenue
Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US
 [2006/41]
Representative(s)Openshaw, Paul Malcolm
Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham
Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Openshaw, Paul Malcolm
Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham
Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
Former [2006/41]Openshaw, Paul Malcolm
Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street
GB-Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB
Application number, filing date05705492.611.01.2005
[2006/41]
WO2005US00860
Priority number, dateUS2004075944016.01.2004         Original published format: US 759440
[2006/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005072495
Date:11.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1709546
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.11.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/16, H04L29/08
[2009/08]
Former International [2006/41]G06F15/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINER PTT-SITZUNGSEINLEITUNG DURCH VERWENDUNG EINES AUF IP BASIERENDEN PROTOKOLLS[2006/41]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING A PTT SESSION INITIATION USING AN IP-BASED PROTOCOL[2006/41]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FACILITER UN LANCEMENT DE SESSION A L'AIDE D'UN PROTOCOLE IP[2006/41]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2006National basic fee paid 
16.08.2006Search fee paid 
16.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/41]
25.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/35]
13.04.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2003190888  (MANGAL MANISH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0058] , [0060] , [0067] , [0100] , [0102] , [0107] * [A] 6-13,15-17;
 [A]US2004008680  (MOSS ALON [IL], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[YE]US2005169203  (SINNARAJAH RAGULAN [US], et al);
 [YE]US2005180362  (CHIN TOM [US], et al)
by applicantUS2003190888
 US2004008680