Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1742710

EP1742710 - STABILIZED ASCORBIC ACID COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal USA Creative, Inc.
575 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10017 / US
[2007/23]
Former [2007/03]For all designated states
Skinceuticals, Inc.
3402 Miller Road
Garland TX 75041 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZIELINSKI, Jan, E.
820 Sycamore Avenue, Apt. 105
Vista, CA 92081 / US
02 / PINNELL, Sheldon, R.
3127 Surrey Road
Durham, NC 27707 / US
 [2007/03]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2007/03]Hanna, Peter William Derek , et al
Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date05705623.611.01.2005
[2007/03]
WO2005US01053
Priority number, dateUS20040536143P13.01.2004         Original published format: US 536143 P
[2007/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005070380
Date:04.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1742710
Date:17.01.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005
[2007/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1742710
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61Q17/00, A61Q19/08, A61K8/67, A61K8/49, A61K8/365, A61K31/375, A61K31/192
[2007/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STABILISIERTE ASCORBINSÄURE-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2007/03]
English:STABILIZED ASCORBIC ACID COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS THEREFOR[2007/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE STABILISEES ET METHODES ASSOCIEES[2007/03]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2006National basic fee paid 
27.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.07.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2006Examination requested  [2007/03]
21.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2009
06.11.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
18.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2009Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.04.2009Fee for grant paid
08.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CY03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
TR03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
HU04.12.2009
IE11.01.2010
LU11.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CY03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
HU04.12.2009
IE11.01.2010
LU11.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
Former [2012/42]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CY03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
HU04.12.2009
IE11.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
Former [2012/37]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CY03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE11.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
Former [2011/07]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
IE11.01.2010
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
Former [2010/52]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
GR04.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
CH31.01.2010
LI31.01.2010
MC31.01.2010
Former [2010/39]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
MC31.01.2010
Former [2010/20]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
DK03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
Former [2010/17]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
BG03.09.2009
SE03.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
PT03.10.2009
Former [2010/12]AT03.06.2009
BE03.06.2009
CZ03.06.2009
EE03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
RO03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SK03.06.2009
SE03.09.2009
IS03.10.2009
Former [2010/01]AT03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
PL03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SE03.09.2009
Former [2009/52]AT03.06.2009
FI03.06.2009
LT03.06.2009
NL03.06.2009
SI03.06.2009
SE03.09.2009
Former [2009/48]LT03.06.2009
Cited inInternational search[Y]FR2655054  (PACIFIC CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-40 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 10 - line 15 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 8; table 2 * * example 2; table 3 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [DY]WO0219972  (VIVIER PHARMA INC; VIVIER, GHISLAIN; VIVIER CANADA INC) [DY] 1-40 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 8 - line 11 * * page 6, line 9 - line 27 * * page 8, line 4 - line 20 * * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * page 11, line 22 - line 23 *;
 [X]JPS5915477  ;
 [A]EP0664290  (L'OREAL) [A] 1-40 * page 2, line 36 - line 40 * * page 4, line 24 - line 30; examples 12,A-C *;
 [A]JPH069603
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840509), vol. 008, no. 098, Database accession no. (C - 221), & JP59015477 A 19840126 (TANABE SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-40 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 07, Database accession no. 1994-053956, XP002325928 & JPH069603 A 19940118 (HASEGAWA CO LTD) [A] 1-40 * abstract *