Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1709284

EP1709284 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR STIFFENING A FLEXIBLE PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.02.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Oil & Gas UK Limited
2, High Street
Nailsea Bristol
BS48 1BS / GB
[2015/02]
Former [2006/41]For all designated states
Wellstream International Limited
Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3PF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FILHO, Helio, Marins, David
Estrada da Urucanga, 756
CEP-22750-030 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
02 / ALBUQUERQUE, Marcio, Henriques
Rua Sampaio Ferraz, 38 apt 101
CEP-20250-040 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR
 [2006/41]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/25]Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York, YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2011/15]Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York
YO1 6JX / GB
Former [2008/34]Boakes, Jason Carrington , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York
YO1 6JX / GB
Former [2007/33]Boakes, Jason Carrington , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate
York, YO1 6JX / GB
Former [2006/41]Boakes, Jason Carrington
Harrison Goddard Foote 31 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date05708214.127.01.2005
[2006/41]
WO2005GB00264
Priority number, dateUS2004076753929.01.2004         Original published format: US 767539
[2006/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005073496
Date:11.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1709284
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005
[2006/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1709284
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.08.2005
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/10, F16L35/00, E21B17/01
[2013/02]
Former International [2006/41]E21B17/10, F16L35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/41]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSTEIFUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN ROHRS[2006/41]
English:ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR STIFFENING A FLEXIBLE PIPE[2006/41]
French:ENSEMBLE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RENFORCER UN TUYAU SOUPLE[2006/41]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2006National basic fee paid 
07.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/41]
09.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2013Fee for grant paid
03.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
National Oilwell Varco Denmark I/S
Priorparken 480
2605 Brøndby / DK
Opponent's representative
Hegner, Anette
Hegner & Partners A/S
Symbion Science Park
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 02  19.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2017/03]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
National Oilwell Varco Denmark I/S
Priorparken 480
2605 Brøndby / DK
Opponent's representative
Hegner, Anette
Hegner & Partners A/S
Banemarksvej 50
2605 Brøndby / DK
 02  19.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2016/34]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
National Oilwell Varco Denmark I/S
Priorparken 480
2605 Brøndby / DK
Opponent's representative
Hegner, Anette
Hegner & Partners A/S
Banemarksvej 50
2605 Brøndby / DK
 02  19.03.2014  31.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix
62, rue de Bonnel
69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2014   
National Oilwell Varco Denmark I/S
Priorparken 480
2605 Brøndby / DK
Opponent's representative
Hegner, Anette
Hegner & Partners A/S Banemarksvej 50
2605 Brøndby / DK
 02  19.03.2014   
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Colombié, Damien
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Etienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
25.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
17.06.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition26.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1873/16
27.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
16.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1873/16
19.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
04.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1873/16
17.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
30.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
28.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.01.2005
AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE27.01.2014
LU27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
DE01.08.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU27.01.2005
AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE27.01.2014
LU27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
DE01.08.2014
Former [2015/07]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
IE27.01.2014
LU27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
DE01.08.2014
Former [2014/47]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
DE01.08.2014
Former [2014/46]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU27.01.2014
CH31.01.2014
LI31.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU27.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/24]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
IT19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/14]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/11]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY10.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT19.06.2013
BE19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]BE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2013/50]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
GR20.09.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/48]LT19.06.2013
ES30.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[XA]US6220303  (SECHER PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [X] 1,7,9 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * * column 5, line 33 - line 52 * * column 6, line 26 - line 53 * * column 11, line 42 - line 50 * * column 12, line 20 - line 27 * * column 13, line 3 - line 8 * * column 14, line 28 - line 58 * * claims 1,5 * [A] 2-6,8,10-14;
 [XA]EP0911482  (DEEP OIL TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,7,9 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - line 53 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0015] * * claim 2 * * figure 3 * [A] 2-6,8,10-14;
 [A]US5526846  (MALOBERTI RENE [FR]) [A] 1,7,9 * abstract * * column 6, line 19 - line 49 * * claims 1,2 *
by applicantUS6220303