Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1715510

EP1715510 - SUBSTRATE CLEANING LIQUID FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND CLEANING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.01.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2016Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 24.02.2016  [2016/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8251 / JP
[2012/27]
Former [2011/15]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation
14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo
108-0014 / JP
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION
33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / IKEMOTO, Makoto, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp.
1-1, Kurosakishiroishi
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / MORINAGA, Hitoshi
2-10-7, Tetsuryuu
Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0058 / JP
 [2016/08]
Former [2006/43]01 / IKEMOTO, Makoto, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp.
1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP
02 / MORINAGA, Hitoshi
2-10-7, Tetsuryuu, Yahatanishi-ku
Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0058 / JP
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Strasse 4
80335 München / DE
[2016/08]
Former [2006/43]ter Meer, Nicolaus
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date05709641.402.02.2005
[2006/43]
WO2005JP01521
Priority number, dateJP2004003222209.02.2004         Original published format: JP 2004032222
[2006/43]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005076332
Date:18.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1715510
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005
[2006/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1715510
Date:13.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/15]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1715510
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.08.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/304
[2006/43]
Designated contracting statesFR,   IT [2016/08]
Former [2007/20]FR,  IT 
Former [2006/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SUBSTRATREINIGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR EIN HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND REINIGUNGSVERFAHREN[2006/43]
English:SUBSTRATE CLEANING LIQUID FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE AND CLEANING METHOD[2006/43]
French:LIQUIDE DE NETTOYAGE POUR SUBSTRAT POUR DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE[2006/43]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2006Translation filed 
31.07.2006National basic fee paid 
31.07.2006Search fee paid 
31.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
23.09.2009Observations by third parties
29.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2011Fee for grant paid
11.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.01.2012  12.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
Opponent's representative
Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft, et al
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/06]
Opponent(s)01  04.01.2012    ADMISSIBLE
Air Products and Chemicals, Inc.
7201 Hamilton Boulevard
Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US
Opponent's representative
Westendorp Sommer
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
21.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.12.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.01.2014
14.01.2014Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2015
28.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.06.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.06.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.09.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.12.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
19.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]WO02086045  (ESC INC) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,15 * example - *;
 [X]WO03091376  (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC) [X] 1-6,15 * page 10, line 10 - line 16; claims 1,11 *;
 [A]WO0130958  (HENKEL KGAA) [A] 1 * tables 1,2 *;
 [A]WO0213242  (EKC TECHNOLOGY INC) [A] 1-17 * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 10 *
International search[X]JP2002289569  ;
 [Y]JP2003289060
otherWO03065433
 US2005020463
 US2003004085
 US6740629
 WO2004037962
 US2004137736
 US2002077259
 EP1628336
 US2006040838