Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1722805

EP1722805 - BIOACTIVE COMPOSITIONS FROM THEACEA PLANTS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry LLC
525 West Van Buren Street
Chicago, IL 60607-3835 / US
[2014/13]
Former [2012/35]For all designated states
Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry LLC
525 West Van Buren Street
Chicago, IL 60607-3835 / US
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
Integrated Botanical Technologies
23 Snowden Avenue
Ossining, New York 10562-3218 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KOGANOV, Michael
30 Lake Street, Apt. 2D
White Plains, NY 10603 / US
 [2006/47]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/13]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2012/43]Simpson, Mark Geoffrey , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2006/47]Miles, John Stephen , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date05711431.612.01.2005
[2006/47]
WO2005US01132
Priority number, dateUS20040535861P12.01.2004         Original published format: US 535861 P
[2006/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005069835
Date:04.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1722805
Date:22.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005
[2006/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1722805
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.01.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/82
[2009/35]
Former International [2006/47]A61K36/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/47]
TitleGerman:BIOAKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS THEACEA-PFLANZEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN PRODUKTION UND VERWENDUNG[2006/47]
English:BIOACTIVE COMPOSITIONS FROM THEACEA PLANTS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE[2006/47]
French:COMPOSITIONS BIOACTIVES DERIVEES DE PLANTES THEACEA ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION[2006/47]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2006National basic fee paid 
11.08.2006Search fee paid 
11.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/47]
27.08.2009Observations by third parties
29.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2014Fee for grant paid
12.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12152951.5  / EP2491939
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2010
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.01.2005
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
[2017/40]
Former [2016/28]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/43]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
RO26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
Former [2014/47]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/46]BE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/37]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0172319  (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MATSUI ET AL, "Fatty acid hydroperoxide cleaving enzyme, hydroperoxide lyase, from tea leaves", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (19910101), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 2109 - 2113, XP002126017 [X] 1-16 * page 2110, column 1, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)83596-D
 [X]  - GENSLER HELEN L ET AL, "Prevention of photocarcinogenesis by topical administration of pure epigallocatechin gallate isolated from green tea", NUTRITION AND CANCER, (1996), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0163-5581, pages 325 - 335, XP009119619 [X] 21-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01635589609514488
 [X]  - ZHAO J ET AL, "Photoprotective effect of black tea extracts against UVB-induced phototoxicity in skin.", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY OCT 1999, (199910), vol. 70, no. 4, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 637 - 644, XP002536103 [X] 21-28 * page 637, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 638, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 642, column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1999.tb08263.x
 [X]  - VAYALIL PRAVEEN K ET AL, "Treatment of green tea polyphenols in hydrophilic cream prevents UVB-induced oxidation of lipids and proteins, depletion of antioxidant enzymes and phosphorylation of MAPK proteins in SKH-1 hairless mouse skin.", CARCINOGENESIS (OXFORD), (200305), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 927 - 936, XP002536104 [X] 17-28 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/CARCIN/BGG025
 [A]  - HUANG MOU-TUAN ET AL, "Effects of tea, decaffeinated tea, and caffeine on UVB light-induced complete carcinogenesis in SKH-1 mice: Demonstration of caffeine as a biologically important constituent of tea", CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, no. 13, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2623 - 2629, XP002536105 [A] 1-42 * page 2627, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 2628, column 2, paragraph 4 * * tables 1-4 *
 [A]  - OKAI YASUJI ET AL, "Potent suppressive activity of nonpolyphenolic fraction of green tea (Camellia sinensis) against genotoxin-induced umu C gene expression in Salmonella typhimurium (TA 1535/pSK 1002), tumor promoter-dependent ornithine decarboxylase induction of BALB/c 3T3 fibroblast cells, and chemically induced mou", TERATOGENESIS CARCINOGENESIS AND MUTAGENESIS, (1997), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0270-3211, pages 305 - 312, XP002536106 [A] 1-42 * page 306, paragraph 4 * * page 310, paragraph 3 *
International search[A]US4897345  (HARRIS PHILIP J [NZ], et al);
 [A]US6616952  (BERQUIST HELEN M [US]);
 [A]US6610749  (LIAO SHUTSUNG [US], et al)
by applicant   - ZIEGLER-HEITBROCK ET AL., ESTABLISHEMENT OF A HUMAN CELL LINE (MONO
other   - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Zimaad-e-chai barai Warm-e-muzmin", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AN/324A, pages 1 - 2, XP003025075
    - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Chai", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AN/324, pages 1 - 3, XP003025063