EP1722805 - BIOACTIVE COMPOSITIONS FROM THEACEA PLANTS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry LLC 525 West Van Buren Street Chicago, IL 60607-3835 / US | [2014/13] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Surface Chemistry LLC 525 West Van Buren Street Chicago, IL 60607-3835 / US | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Integrated Botanical Technologies 23 Snowden Avenue Ossining, New York 10562-3218 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOGANOV, Michael 30 Lake Street, Apt. 2D White Plains, NY 10603 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Simpson, Mark Geoffrey, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05711431.6 | 12.01.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US01132 | Priority number, date | US20040535861P | 12.01.2004 Original published format: US 535861 P | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005069835 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722805 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722805 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/82 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
A61K36/82 (EP,US);
C01G23/053 (KR);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | A61K36/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Title | German: | BIOAKTIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS THEACEA-PFLANZEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN PRODUKTION UND VERWENDUNG | [2006/47] | English: | BIOACTIVE COMPOSITIONS FROM THEACEA PLANTS AND PROCESSES FOR THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE | [2006/47] | French: | COMPOSITIONS BIOACTIVES DERIVEES DE PLANTES THEACEA ET LEURS PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION ET D'UTILISATION | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 27.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12152951.5 / EP2491939 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.01.2005 | AT | 26.03.2014 | BE | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | SE | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 26.03.2014 | |
BE | 26.03.2014 | ||
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
SE | 26.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0172319 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US], et al) [A] 1-42* the whole document *; | [X] - MATSUI ET AL, "Fatty acid hydroperoxide cleaving enzyme, hydroperoxide lyase, from tea leaves", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (19910101), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 2109 - 2113, XP002126017 [X] 1-16 * page 2110, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)83596-D | [X] - GENSLER HELEN L ET AL, "Prevention of photocarcinogenesis by topical administration of pure epigallocatechin gallate isolated from green tea", NUTRITION AND CANCER, (1996), vol. 26, no. 3, ISSN 0163-5581, pages 325 - 335, XP009119619 [X] 21-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/01635589609514488 | [X] - ZHAO J ET AL, "Photoprotective effect of black tea extracts against UVB-induced phototoxicity in skin.", PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY OCT 1999, (199910), vol. 70, no. 4, ISSN 0031-8655, pages 637 - 644, XP002536103 [X] 21-28 * page 637, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 638, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 642, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1751-1097.1999.tb08263.x | [X] - VAYALIL PRAVEEN K ET AL, "Treatment of green tea polyphenols in hydrophilic cream prevents UVB-induced oxidation of lipids and proteins, depletion of antioxidant enzymes and phosphorylation of MAPK proteins in SKH-1 hairless mouse skin.", CARCINOGENESIS (OXFORD), (200305), vol. 24, no. 5, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 927 - 936, XP002536104 [X] 17-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/CARCIN/BGG025 | [A] - HUANG MOU-TUAN ET AL, "Effects of tea, decaffeinated tea, and caffeine on UVB light-induced complete carcinogenesis in SKH-1 mice: Demonstration of caffeine as a biologically important constituent of tea", CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, no. 13, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2623 - 2629, XP002536105 [A] 1-42 * page 2627, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 2628, column 2, paragraph 4 * * tables 1-4 * | [A] - OKAI YASUJI ET AL, "Potent suppressive activity of nonpolyphenolic fraction of green tea (Camellia sinensis) against genotoxin-induced umu C gene expression in Salmonella typhimurium (TA 1535/pSK 1002), tumor promoter-dependent ornithine decarboxylase induction of BALB/c 3T3 fibroblast cells, and chemically induced mou", TERATOGENESIS CARCINOGENESIS AND MUTAGENESIS, (1997), vol. 17, no. 6, ISSN 0270-3211, pages 305 - 312, XP002536106 [A] 1-42 * page 306, paragraph 4 * * page 310, paragraph 3 * | International search | [A]US4897345 (HARRIS PHILIP J [NZ], et al); | [A]US6616952 (BERQUIST HELEN M [US]); | [A]US6610749 (LIAO SHUTSUNG [US], et al) | by applicant | - ZIEGLER-HEITBROCK ET AL., ESTABLISHEMENT OF A HUMAN CELL LINE (MONO | other | - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Zimaad-e-chai barai Warm-e-muzmin", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AN/324A, pages 1 - 2, XP003025075 | - MOHD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Chai", KEY ATTRIBUTES OF TKDL AN/324, pages 1 - 3, XP003025063 |