Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1665133

EP1665133 - PICTURE CODING METHOD, PICTURE DECODING METHOD, PICTURE CODING APPARATUS, PICTURE DECODING APPARATUS, AND PROGRAM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.05.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue, Suite 200
Torrance, CA 90503 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Panasonic Intellectual Property Corporation of America
20000 Mariner Avenue
Suite 200
Torrance CA 90503 / US
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2006/23]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industries Co., Ltd.
1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kadono, Shinya
8-3-2-203, Atagoyama
Nishinomiya-shi 662-0871 Hyogo / JP
02 / Kashiwagi, Yoshiichiro
179 West Palm Drive
Arcadia, CA 91007 / US
03 / Lu, Jiuhuai
4200 Cartesian Circle
Palos Verdes Peninsula, CA 90274 / US
04 / Lim, Chong Soon
Blk 842, Sims Ave., 07-760
400842 Singapore / SG
05 / Tao, Chen
2408 Sunbright Drive
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US
 [2006/23]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2006/23]Eisenführ, Günther
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date05711937.219.01.2005
[2006/23]
WO2005US02227
Priority number, dateUS20040538065P20.01.2004         Original published format: US 538065 P
US20040561351P12.04.2004         Original published format: US 561351 P
[2006/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005072312
Date:11.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1665133
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005
[2006/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.07.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/36, G06K9/46, H04N7/12, H04N11/02, H04N11/04, H04N7/26, H04N7/50
[2009/19]
Former International [2006/23]G06K9/36, G06K9/46, H04N7/12, H04N11/02, H04N11/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, BILDDECODIERUNGSVERFAHREN; BILDCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG; BILDDECODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM DAFÜR[2006/23]
English:PICTURE CODING METHOD, PICTURE DECODING METHOD, PICTURE CODING APPARATUS, PICTURE DECODING APPARATUS, AND PROGRAM THEREOF[2006/23]
French:PROCEDE DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, PROCEDE DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE, APPAREIL DE CODAGE D'IMAGE, APPAREIL DE DECODAGE D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME CORRESPONDANT[2006/23]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2006National basic fee paid 
10.03.2006Search fee paid 
10.03.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2006Examination requested  [2006/23]
15.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination28.10.2015Appeal received No.  T2168/15
30.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
01.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9835503  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; SHEN SHENG MEI [SG]; TAN THIOW KE) [X] 1-26 * page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 7 * * figure 6 *;
 [A]US5241383  (CHEN CHENG-TIE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-26 * column 9, lines 3-16 *;
 [A]  - "ITU-T RECOMMENDATION H.262, INTERNATIONAL STANDARD ISO/IEC 13818.2 MPEG-2 VIDEO. TRANSMISSION OF NON-TELEPHONE SIGNALS. INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - GENERIC CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO INFORMATION: VIDEO", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, GENEVA, CH, (19950701), pages 54 - 55,68, XP002520643 [A] 1-26 * pages 54-55, paragraph 6.3.11 * * page 68, paragraph 7.3.1 *
 [A]  - YUN Q. SHI, HUIFANG SUN, "Image and Video Compression for Multimedia Engineering"", CRC PRESS, USA, (2000), ISBN 978 0 849 33491 7, pages 55 - 60, XP002520644 [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US6928113  (MIHARA KANJI [JP]);
 [Y]US2004234149  (CHANG YUNG-CHING [TW]);
 [Y]US6577681  (KIMURA SHUNICHI [JP])
by applicantWO9835503