Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1716358

EP1716358 - CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR MALE AND FEMALE MEMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2012
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dana Canada Corporation
656 Kerr Street
Oakville, Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
Dana Canada Corporation
656 Kerr Street Oakville
Ontario L6K 3E4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / MUHAMMAD, Anis
5730 Montevideo Road, Unit 15
Mississauga, Ontario L5N 2M4 / CA
02 / SHEPPARD, Jeff
731 Laurier Avenue
Milton, Ontario L9T 4R1 / CA
 [2006/44]
Representative(s)Golkowsky, Stefan , et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/46]Golkowsky, Stefan , et al
Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12
10719 Berlin / DE
Former [2006/44]Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M.
HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date05714465.118.02.2005
[2006/44]
WO2005CA00218
Priority number, dateCA2004245797819.02.2004         Original published format: CA 2457978
[2006/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005080853
Date:01.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1716358
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005
[2006/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1716358
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA01.09.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:F16L37/091, F16L37/098
[2009/21]
Former International [2006/44]F16L19/065, F16L23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/44]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDERANORDNUNG FÜR STECK- UND AUFNAHMEGLIEDER[2006/44]
English:CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR MALE AND FEMALE MEMBERS[2006/44]
French:ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR POUR ELEMENTS MALES ET FEMELLES[2006/44]
Entry into regional phase13.09.2006National basic fee paid 
13.09.2006Search fee paid 
13.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/44]
30.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2011Fee for grant paid
04.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2005
AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
IT06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
[2014/34]
Former [2014/32]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
IT06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2014/21]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2013/29]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/11]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/10]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
SK06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/09]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
CZ06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2012/02]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2012/01]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/52]AT06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/48]LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/41]SI06.04.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6267416  (REA INTERNATIONAL INC.) [X] 1,9-11,13-15,19 * abstract * * column 4, lines 38-57 * [Y] 2-8,12,16-18,20-23;
 [Y]US2003168856  (KAMINSKI VOLKER [DE] ET AL) [Y] 2,4,12,21,22 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5303963  (BUNDY CORP.) [Y] 3,5-8,16-18,20,23 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1098127  (TI GROUP AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS CO [US] TI GROUP AUTOMOTIVE SYS LLC [US]) [A] 3,20,23 * abstract *;
 [A]US5437483  (UMEZAWA KATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 18 * abstract *
International search[Y]US6447024  (OLSON DARWIN [US]);
 [Y]US6155607  (HEWITT ROBERT W [US], et al);
 [Y]US6267416  (FERREIRA LUIS [CA], et al);
 [Y]US5303963  (MCNAUGHTON JAMES [US], et al)
by applicantUS6267416
 US2003168856
 US5303963