Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1809345

EP1809345 - A MEDICAL DEVICE HAVING A WETTED HYDROPHILIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  09.11.2012
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, CY, PT, TR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coloplast A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]For all designated states
COLOPLAST A/S
Holtedam 1
3050 Humlebaek / DK
Inventor(s)01 / MADSEN, Niels, Joergen
Forelvej 18
DK-3450 Alleroed / DK
02 / SCHOENFELDT, Lars
Allegade 38, 1
DK-3000 Helsingoer / DK
 [2007/37]
Former [2007/30]01 / MADSEN, Niels, Joergen
Forelvej 18
DK-3450 Alleroed / DK
02 / SCHOENFELDT, Lars
Stolbjergvej 26C
DK-3070 Snekersten / DK
Application number, filing date05715151.606.04.2005
[2007/30]
WO2005DK00233
Priority number, dateWO2004DK0067707.10.2004         Original published format: PCT/DK2004/000677
[2007/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006037321
Date:13.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1809345
Date:25.07.2007
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2006
[2007/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1809345
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.04.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61L29/08, A61L29/14, C09D175/04, C09D171/02
[2007/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER BEFEUCHTETEN HYDROPHILEN BESCHICHTUNG[2009/11]
English:A MEDICAL DEVICE HAVING A WETTED HYDROPHILIC COATING[2007/30]
French:DISPOSITIF MEDICAL A REVETEMENT HYDROPHILE HUMIDIFIE[2007/30]
Former [2007/30]MEDIZINPRODUKT MIT BENETZTER HYDROPHILER BESCHICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase07.05.2007National basic fee paid 
07.05.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/30]
11.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2009Fee for grant paid
23.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09155340.4  / EP2090628
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.07.2009  29.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
Høiberg P/S
Adelgade 12
1304 Copenhagen K / DK
 02  18.12.2009  05.01.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Astra Tech AB
Aminogatan 1
421 31 Mölndal / SE
Opponent's representative
Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar
Awapatent AB
Södra Hamngatan 37-41
404 28 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/04]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2009  29.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
HOEIBERG A/S
European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
 02  18.12.2009   
Astra Tech AB
Aminogatan 1
421 31 Mölndal / SE
Opponent's representative
Lind, Urban Arvid Oskar
AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Former [2009/36]
Opponent(s)01  23.07.2009  29.07.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Hollister Incorporated
2000 Hollister Drive
Libertyville, Illinois 60048-3781 / US
Opponent's representative
HOEIBERG A/S
European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59 A
1264 Copenhagen K / DK
25.01.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.07.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.04.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2012
13.06.2012Date of oral proceedings
25.07.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.08.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE18.03.2009
CY18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
PT18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
TR18.03.2009
LU06.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.06.2009
GR19.06.2009
IS18.07.2009
AT06.04.2011
[2015/21]
Former [2011/22]BE18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
LU06.04.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.06.2009
GR19.06.2009
IS18.07.2009
Former [2010/52]BE18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.06.2009
GR19.06.2009
IS18.07.2009
Former [2010/21]BE18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
MC30.04.2009
BG18.06.2009
IS18.07.2009
Former [2010/12]BE18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
CH30.04.2009
LI30.04.2009
BG18.06.2009
IS18.07.2009
Former [2009/52]BE18.03.2009
CZ18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
RO18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
SK18.03.2009
IS18.07.2009
Former [2009/48]BE18.03.2009
EE18.03.2009
FI18.03.2009
LT18.03.2009
PL18.03.2009
SI18.03.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0439908  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1,4,9,15,16 * claims 1,6,10 *
by applicantUS5416131
 WO0030696