Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1877243

EP1877243 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF MANUFACTURING A HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.09.2008
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
16.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 176
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2008/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SAUTER, Jürgen
Karlstrasse 61
68307 Mannheim / DE
02 / SCHINKOREIT, Wolfram
Forsthausstr. 18
69483 Wald-Michelbach / DE
03 / MAULER, Dirk
Weinheimer Strasse 32
68549 Ilvesheim / DE
 [2008/40]
Former [2008/03]01 / SAUTER, Jürgen
Karlstrasse 61
68307 Mannheim / DE
02 / SCHINKOREIT, Wolfram
Schützenstrasse 13
69518 Unterabtsteinach / DE
03 / MAULER, Dirk
Weinheimer Strasse 32
68549 Ilvesheim / DE
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2008/03]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date05716302.422.03.2005
[2008/03]
WO2005EP03056
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006099881
Date:28.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1877243
Date:16.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006
[2008/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1877243
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:B31F1/07
[2008/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/03]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HYGIENEPAPIERPRODUKTS[2008/03]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS OF MANUFACTURING A HYGIENE PAPER PRODUCT[2008/03]
French:METHODE ET APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT DE PAPIER HYGIENIQUE[2008/03]
Entry into regional phase20.09.2007National basic fee paid 
20.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.2007Examination requested  [2008/03]
20.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2008Fee for grant paid
22.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009  02.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn
30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2013/15]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009  02.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
SCA TISSUE FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 Bois-Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2012/37]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009  02.08.2012  WITHDRAWN
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2010/36]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009  07.08.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
60, avenue de l'Europe
92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2009/52]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009  07.08.2009  ADMISSIBLE
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
11, route industrielle KUNHEIM
68320 Kuhnheim / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
Former [2009/33]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2009   
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE
11, route industrielle KUNHEIM
68320 Kuhnheim / FR
Opponent's representative
Kohn, Philippe, et al
Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche
93500 Pantin / FR
12.08.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.02.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
24.04.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.04.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1246/15
24.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
TR08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
PL22.03.2016
SK22.03.2016
[2017/44]
Former [2017/11]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
TR08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
SK22.03.2016
Former [2015/21]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CY08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
TR08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2011/22]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
LU22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/52]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
GR09.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/12]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
CH31.03.2009
LI31.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2010/07]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
IE22.03.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/48]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
CZ08.10.2008
DK08.10.2008
EE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
RO08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
MC31.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT08.10.2008
BE08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/27]AT08.10.2008
LT08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
BG08.01.2009
IS08.02.2009
PT18.02.2009
Former [2009/21]LT08.10.2008
SI08.10.2008
Former [2009/17]SI08.10.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]US1967726  (SHERMAN HAROLD W) [X] 22,23,25 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 98; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0922422  (POPP JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 22-24 * paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2,4,5 * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]WO9609162  (PWA HYGIENEPAPIERE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19959832  (HAKLE KIMBERLY DE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4545780  (MARTIN WILLIAM E [US]) [A] 1,4,5,8,15 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 53; figures 1-3 *