Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1721237

EP1721237 - WEARABLE MODULAR INTERFACE STRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2013
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daniel, Simon Richard
Abbotswood, Rowhills
Farnham
Surrey GU9 9AU / GB
For all designated states
Wright, Christopher Verity
Frigg's Mill
116 Bath Road
Stroud GL5 3NX / GB
[2012/35]
Former [2006/46]For all designated states
Daniel, Simon Richard
Abbotswood, Rowhills Farnham
Surrey GU9 9AU / GB
For all designated states
Wright, Christopher Verity
Friggs Mill 116 Bath Road
Stroud GL5 3NX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2006/46]
Representative(s)Freeman, Avi , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/35]Freeman, Avi , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Avi , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place
GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2009/37]Flint, Adam
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London
WC1V 6HR / GB
Former [2006/46]Flint, Adam
Beck Greener, Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date05717797.425.02.2005
[2006/46]
WO2005GB00716
Priority number, dateGB2004000443527.02.2004         Original published format: GB 0404435
GB2004001526007.07.2004         Original published format: GB 0415260
[2006/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005083546
Date:09.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1721237
Date:15.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005
[2006/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1721237
Date:29.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, H04B1/38
[2006/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/46]
TitleGerman:Tragbares modulares Schnittstellen-Armband[2011/51]
English:WEARABLE MODULAR INTERFACE STRAP[2006/46]
French:SANGLE PORTABLE A INTERFACES MODULAIRES[2006/46]
Former [2006/46]TRAGBARER MODULARER SCHNITTSTELLEN-STRAP
Entry into regional phase21.09.2006National basic fee paid 
21.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/46]
10.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.2012Fee for grant paid
19.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2011
Opposition(s)30.05.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
11.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
13.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.02.2005
AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE25.02.2013
LU25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
TR29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
IE25.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/48]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/34]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
BG29.11.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/23]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CY29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
IT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
PL29.08.2012
RO29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
SK29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/22]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
CZ29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
EE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
ES10.12.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/21]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
DK29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/13]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
PT31.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT29.08.2012
BE29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
SE29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
SI29.08.2012
GR30.11.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
IS29.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT29.08.2012
FI29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
Former [2013/08]AT29.08.2012
LT29.08.2012
Former [2013/07]AT29.08.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1174049  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0025] , [0028] - [0030] * * figures 1A,1B,1C,2A,2B *;
 [A]US6536941  (FANG CHIH-PING [TW]) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 22 * * figures 1,2,4,5 *;
 [A]US4586827  (HIRSCH HERMANN [AT], et al) [A] 1-33 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS6249487
 EP1174049
 US6536941