Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1722751

EP1722751 - THE USE OF A CATIONICALLY MODIFIED HYDROLYSED STARCH AS A HAIR FIXATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRODA INTERNATIONAL PLC
Cowick Hall Snaith Goole
North Humberside DN14 9AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
CRODA INTERNATIONAL plc
Cowick Hall Snaith Goole
North Humberside DN14 9AA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / JONES, Roger, T.
38 Forest Close Cuddington
Cheshire CW8 2EE / GB
02 / JONES, Debra, L.
22 Homefield Close, Brayton Selby
North Yorkshire YO8 9LR / GB
 [2006/52]
Former [2006/47]01 / JONES, Roger, T.
38 Forest Close Cuddington
Cheshire CW8 2EE / GB
02 / JONES, Debra, L.
2 Henry's Mews Sherburn-in-Elmet
North Yorkshire LS25 6PF / GB
Representative(s)Craven, Ian , et al
Croda Europe Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Cowick Hall
Snaith
Goole Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]Humphries, Martyn , et al
Croda Europe Limited Intellectual Property Cowick Hall Snaith Goole
East Yorkshire DN14 9AA / GB
Former [2009/26]Humphries, Martyn , et al
Croda International plc Intellectual Property Department Wilton Centre Wilton Redcar
TS10 4RF / GB
Former [2009/16]Humphries, Martyn , et al
Croda Europe Limited Intellectual Property Department Wilton Centre Wilton
Redcar TS10 4RF / GB
Former [2008/41]Humphries, Martyn , et al
Croda International Limited Intellectual Property Department Wilton Centre Wilton
Redcar, TS10 4RF / GB
Former [2007/13]Humphries, Martyn , et al
Croda Intellectual Property Department Wilton Centre Wilton
Redcar TS10 4RF / GB
Former [2006/50]Coates, Ian Harold , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2006/47]Coates, Ian Harold , et al
Marks & Clerk 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date05717971.509.03.2005
[2006/47]
WO2005GB00906
Priority number, dateGB2004000523609.03.2004         Original published format: GB 0405236
[2006/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005084620
Date:15.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1722751
Date:22.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2005
[2006/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/18
[2006/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/47]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINER KATIONISCH MODIFIZIRTEN HYDROLYSIERTEN STÄRKE ALS HAARFIXIERMITTEL[2006/47]
English:THE USE OF A CATIONICALLY MODIFIED HYDROLYSED STARCH AS A HAIR FIXATIVE[2006/47]
French:UTILISATION D'UN AMIDON HYDROLYSE MODIFIE D'UN POINT DE VUE CATIONIQUE COMME FIXATEUR CAPILLAIRE[2006/47]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2006National basic fee paid 
08.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/47]
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
20.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/49]
09.10.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/49]
Appeal following examination08.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1462/17
02.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
09.10.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
26.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[X]US2001018046  (VITALE MELISSA J ET AL) [X] 1-18 * column 1, paragraph 9 * * column 3, paragraph 37 * * examples 3,5-7; claims 1,11-13,25 *;
 [X]US3639389  (GLENN ARDEN HULL) [X] 9,11-15 * column 1, lines 66-69 * * column 2, lines 34-37 * * column 6, lines 46,47 * * column 7, lines 26,27 * * column 7, lines 40-43 * * column 13, lines 5-7 *;
 [A]EP0577519  (L'OREAL) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003129210  (CHOWDHARY MANJIT) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *