blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1714404 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1714404



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1306
23.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 Closure of limitation/revocation proceedings Limitation procedure 1
14.10.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Limitation procedure 1
14.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
14.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
14.08.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Limitation procedure 1
14.08.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Limitation procedure 1
26.06.2014 Decision to limit the patent Limitation procedure 1
11.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
11.06.2014 French translation of claims Limitation procedure 4
11.06.2014 German translation of the claims Limitation procedure 6
11.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 2
11.06.2014 Letter regarding the translation of the limited claims Limitation procedure 1
10.03.2014 Annex to the communication on the allowance of the limitation Limitation procedure 2
10.03.2014 Communication on the allowance of the limitation of the European patent Limitation procedure 3
10.03.2014 Druckexemplar in limitation procedure Limitation procedure 30
27.02.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Limitation procedure 1
20.01.2014 Claims Limitation procedure 5
20.01.2014 Claims Limitation procedure 5
20.01.2014 Reply to the limitation report Limitation procedure 4
20.12.2013 Annex to the communication - Limitation Limitation procedure 5
20.12.2013 Report regarding the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 1
09.12.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Limitation procedure 1
06.12.2013 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Limitation procedure 1
05.12.2013 Claims Limitation procedure 2
05.12.2013 Claims Limitation procedure 2
05.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Limitation procedure 5
05.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Limitation procedure 34
05.12.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Limitation procedure 65
05.12.2013 Observations by third parties Limitation procedure 12
29.11.2013 Citation filed by a third party Limitation procedure 65
29.11.2013 Citation filed by a third party Limitation procedure 38
29.11.2013 Citation filed by a third party Limitation procedure 5
29.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Limitation procedure 1
29.11.2013 Observations by third parties Limitation procedure 13
26.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
26.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
26.11.2013 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 1
25.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Limitation procedure 1
25.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Limitation procedure 1
25.11.2013 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 1
25.11.2013 Note on telephone consultation Limitation procedure 1
05.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Limitation procedure 4
05.11.2013 Claims Limitation procedure 4
05.11.2013 Letter/request relating to the limitation procedure Limitation procedure 4
05.11.2013 Payment of fees and costs Limitation procedure 1
05.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Limitation procedure 1
05.11.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Limitation procedure 1
21.04.2010 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.05.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
28.04.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.04.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
28.04.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
22.12.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.12.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.12.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.12.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 52
27.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 9
27.10.2008 Claims Search / examination 5
27.10.2008 Description Search / examination 6
27.10.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 5
26.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.04.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.04.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.03.2008 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
28.02.2008 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.02.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.02.2008 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
07.12.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
05.11.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.11.2007 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
27.09.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
25.08.2006 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 1
23.08.2006 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
23.08.2006 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
10.08.2006 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
31.07.2006 Annex Search / examination 1
31.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 16
31.07.2006 Claims Search / examination 10
31.07.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
30.06.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 54
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 92
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 40
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 89
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 82
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 100
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 86
13.09.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65
25.08.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
25.08.2005 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 55