blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1714404


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.06.2014 (Expected) limited patent specification published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
14.06.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for limitation of patent
14.03.2014 Request for limitation of patent allowed: despatch of communication published on  16.04.2014  [2014/16]
28.01.2014 New entry: Reply to communication from examining division in limitation procedure + time limit
20.12.2013 New entry: communication from examining division procedure + time limit
03.12.2013 New entry: Observations by third parties
29.11.2013 Request for limitation of patent admissible published on  01.01.2014  [2014/01]
13.11.2013 New entry: Request for limitation filed
23.04.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.05.2010  [2010/21]
15.05.2009 (Expected) grant published on  17.06.2009  [2009/25]
08.05.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.05.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
17.04.2009 Change - divisional application(s) published on  20.05.2009  [2009/21]
10.02.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.12.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.11.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.11.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.06.2008 Change - first examination report published on  16.07.2008  [2008/29]
12.06.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.05.2008 First examination report
21.05.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.02.2008 Supplementary search report published on  12.03.2008  [2008/11]
07.02.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.11.2007 Change - classification published on  05.12.2007  [2007/49]
20.04.2007 Change - designated states published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
20.04.2007 Change - extension states published on  23.05.2007  [2007/21]
07.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]
22.09.2006 Request for examination filed published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]
16.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
15.03.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
21.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
27.08.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication