blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1714404

Designated contracting states DE 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 SE 
Examination procedure29.11.2013Observations by third parties
Entry into regional phase25.08.2005Translation filed 
31.07.2006National basic fee paid 
31.07.2006Search fee paid 
31.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted17.06.2009
Opposition procedure18.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit published on 19.05.2010 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20060731
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:05.12.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04B 7/26 20060101AFI20060315BHEP
 
Event date:05.12.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04B 1/707 20060101ALI20071030BHEP
 
Event date:05.12.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H04J 11/00 20060101ALI20071030BHEP
 
Event date:12.03.2008 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080211
 
Event date:25.06.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080526
 
Event date:16.07.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED (CORRECTED)
Effective DATE:20080616
 
Event date:17.06.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FI FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:17.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:30.07.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:602005014940
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20090730
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:13.10.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:26.05.2010 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20100318
 
Event date:26.08.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
 
Event date:04.04.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:COUNTERCLAIM LODGED; COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 28 SEPTEMBER 2011 (HC11C02180)
 
Event date:26.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S75Z
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)
Free Format Text:APPLICATION FILED; PATENT COURT ACTION NUMBER: HC 11 C 02180 TITLE OF PATENT: APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING OVSF CODES AND I/Q CHANNELS FOR REDUCING PEAK-TO-AVERAGE POWER RATIO IN TRANSMITTING DATA VIA ENHANCED UP-LINK DEDICATED CHANNELS IN WCDMA SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL CLASSIFICATION: H04B NAME OF PATENT PROPRIETOR: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., PROPRIETOR'S ADDRESS FOR SERVICE: BRISTOWS 100 VICTORIA EMBANKMENT LONDON EC4Y 0DH THESE AMENDMENTS MAY BE VIEWED ON OUR WEBSITE.
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:APPEAL LODGED; APPEAL LODGED AT THE COURT OF APPEAL ON 29 MAY 2013 AGAINST COURT ORDER DATED 8 MAY 2013 (2013/1432)
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:PATENT REVOKED - STAYED PENDING APPEAL; COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 28 SEPTEMBER 2011. IT IS DECLARED THAT THE PATENT IS INVALID, BOTH AS GRANTED AND AS PROPOSED TO BE AMENDED. IT IS ORDERED THAT THE PATENT BE REVOKED, STAYED PENDING APPEAL. PERMISSION TO APPEAL IS GRANTED BY COURT ORDER DATED 8 MAY 2013 (HC11C02180).
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S75Z
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)
Free Format Text:APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT UNDER SECTION 75 FILED ON 21 AUGUST 2012 DISMISSED, PERMISSION TO APPEAL IS GRANTED BY COURT ORDER DATED 8 MAY 2013 (HC11C02180)
 
Event date:05.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R055 602005014940 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENTEE'S LIMITATION REQUEST RECEIVED BY EPO
 
Event date:01.01.2014 
Event description:REQUEST FOR LIMITATION FOUND ADMISSIBLE
Free Format Text:SEQUENCE NO: 1; FILED AFTER OPPOSITION PERIOD
Filing DATE:20131105
Effective DATE:20131105
 
Event date:10.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602005014940 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:22.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R056 602005014940 DE
Code Expl.:-PATENT LIMITED BY EPO AT PATENTEE'S REQUEST
Effective DATE:20140310
 
Event date:30.06.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140211
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:PATENT REVOKED
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S75Z
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF PATENT IN INFRINGEMENT OR REVOCATION PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 75/PATENTS ACT 1977)
Free Format Text:APPEAL DISMISSED; APPLICATION FOR AMENDMENT UNDER SECTION 75 FILED ON 21 AUGUST 2012. PERMISSION TO APPEAL IS DISMISSED BY CONSENT ORDER DATED 19 AUGUST 2014. (HC11 C02180)
 
Event date:01.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:APPEAL DISMISSED: PATENT REVOKED; APPEAL LODGED ON 29 MAY 2013 IS DISMISSED BY CONSENT ORDER DATED 28 AUGUST 2014 (A3/2013/1430)
 
Event date:28.10.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE REB3
Code Expl.:+PATENT HAS BEEN LIMITED BY THE EPO
Effective DATE:20140723
 
Event date:28.11.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20130508
 
Event date:26.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:26.01.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:24.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20190122
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190124
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190122
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20190208
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20190122
Year of Fee Payment:15