Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1714404

EP1714404 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING OVSF CODES AND I/Q CHANNELS FOR REDUCING PEAK-TO-AVERAGE POWER RATIO IN TRANSMITTING DATA VIA ENHANCED UP-LINK DEDICATED CHANNELS IN WCDMA SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been limited
Status updated on  20.06.2014
Database last updated on 21.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2014(Expected) limited patent specificationpublished on 23.07.2014  [2014/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[2014/30]
Former [2006/43]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-city, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / CHO, Joon-Young, 124-802 Hwanggolmaeul 1-danji APT
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR
02 / LEE, Ju-Ho 730-304 Salgugol Hyundai APT
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-736 / KR
03 / HEO, Youn-Hyoung
303, 1003-14 Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-813 / KR
04 / KWAK, Yong-Jun
101-1601 Daejin 1-cha APT
Jukjeon 1-dong
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-752 / KR
05 / KIM, Young-Bum
302, Seongji Villa
349-123 Sindang-dong
Jung-gu
Seoul 100-450 / KR
 [2014/30]
Former [2006/43]01 / CHO, Joon-Young, 124-802 Hwanggolmaeul 1-danji APT
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR
02 / LEE, Ju-Ho 730-304 Salgugol Hyundai APT
Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-736 / KR
03 / HEO, Youn-Hyoung
303, 1003-14 Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-813 / KR
04 / KWAK, Yong-Jun
101-1601 Daejin 1-cha APT, Jukjeon 1-dong
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-752 / KR
05 / KIM, Young-Bum
302, Seongji Villa, 349-123 Sindang-dong, Jung-gu
Seoul 100-450 / KR
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Zimmermann & Partner
Josephspitalstr. 15
80331 München / DE
Former [2006/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date05721851.314.02.2005
[2006/43]
WO2005KR00402
Priority number, dateKR2004000982114.02.2004         Original published format: KR 2004009821
KR2004001156520.02.2004         Original published format: KR 2004011565
KR2004003241007.05.2004         Original published format: KR 2004032410
KR2004004512717.06.2004         Original published format: KR 2004045127
KR2004005567616.07.2004         Original published format: KR 2004055676
KR2004007354714.09.2004         Original published format: KR 2004073547
KR2004007525620.09.2004         Original published format: KR 2004075256
KR2004009057708.11.2004         Original published format: KR 2004090577
KR2004009109709.11.2004         Original published format: KR 2004091097
KR2004009374016.11.2004         Original published format: KR 2004093740
[2006/43]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005078964
Date:25.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1714404
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005
[2006/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1714404
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/25]
Type: B3 Limited patent 
No.:EP1714404
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.08.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/26, H04B1/707, H04J11/00
[2007/49]
Former International [2006/43]H04B7/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2007/21]
Former [2006/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUTEILEN VON OVSF-CODES UND I/Q-KANÄLEN ZUR REDUKTION DES LEISTUNGSVERHÄLTNISSES VON SPITZE ZU MITTELWERT BEIM SENDEN VON DATEN ÜBER ERWEITERTE SPEZIELLE AUFWÄRTSSTRECKENKANÄLE IN WCDMA-SYSTEMEN[2006/43]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ALLOCATING OVSF CODES AND I/Q CHANNELS FOR REDUCING PEAK-TO-AVERAGE POWER RATIO IN TRANSMITTING DATA VIA ENHANCED UP-LINK DEDICATED CHANNELS IN WCDMA SYSTEMS[2006/43]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE D'AFFECTATION DE CODES OVSF ET DE CANAUX I/Q POUR REDUIRE LE RAPPORT DE PUISSANCE CRETE/MOYENNE DANS LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNEES VIA DES CANAUX DEDIES DE LIAISON MONTANTE AMELIORES DANS DES SYSTEMES WCDMA[2006/43]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2005Translation filed 
31.07.2006National basic fee paid 
31.07.2006Search fee paid 
31.07.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR
31.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/43]
16.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2009Fee for grant paid
28.04.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.11.2013Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP09005009.7  / EP2075928
Opposition(s)18.03.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21]
Limitations:05.11.2013Date of receipt of request for limitation
 admissible
10.03.2014Communication of intention to limit the patent
11.06.2014Fee for printing patent specification after limitation
20.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
20.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US2003108025  (KIM SUNG-HOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-55 * claims 1-18 *;
 [A]US2003031119  (KIM SEONG-HUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-55 * paragraphs [0031] - [0039] *;
 [A]US2003002472  (CHOI SUNG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-55 * claims 1-20 *;
 [A]EP1248485  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-55 * paragraphs [0020] - [0025] *;
 [A]US2002018457  (CHOI SUNG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 1-55 * claims 1-15 *;
 [A]WO03071707  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-55 * claims 1-6 *
International search[X]KR20030055774  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [A]US2002018457  (CHOI SUNG-HO [KR], et al);
 [A]WO03071707  (QUALCOMM INC [US]);
 [AP]US2004085924  (ZHANG WENFENG [US], et al)