Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1877017

EP1877017 - A PANT-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Change: Date of oral proceedings 
23.11.2018Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCA Hygiene Products AB
405 03 Göteborg / SE
[2008/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WENNERBÄCK, Margareta
Violinvägen 12
S-435 44 Mölnlycke / SE
 [2008/03]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/32]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2009/51]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Former [2008/03]Valea AB
Lindholmspiren 5
417 56 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date05722177.202.03.2005
[2008/03]
WO2005SE00307
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2006093439
Date:08.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1877017
Date:16.01.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006
[2008/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1877017
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A61F5/44
[2008/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/03]
TitleGerman:SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL VOM HÖSCHENTYP[2008/03]
English:A PANT-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE[2008/03]
French:ARTICLE ABSORBANT DE TYPE PANTALON[2008/03]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2007National basic fee paid 
28.09.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.09.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.09.2007Examination requested  [2008/03]
23.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.06.2013Fee for grant paid
26.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13150761.8  / EP2581070
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Indas, S.A.U.
Camino Cerro de los Gamos n° 1
Edificio 3
Pta.3ª (Parque Empresarial Cerro de los Gamos)
28224 Pozuelo De Alarcon (Madrid) / ES
Opponent's representative
Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al
Herrero & Asociados, S.L.
Cedaceros 1
28014 Madrid / ES
 02  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 03  07.05.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Friedrichstraße 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/27]
Opponent(s)01  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Indas, S.A.U.
Camino Cerro de los Gamos n° 1
Edificio 3
Pta.3ª (Parque Empresarial Cerro de los Gamos)
28224 Pozuelo De Alarcon (Madrid) / ES
Opponent's representative
Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al
Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35
28014 Madrid / ES
 02  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 03  07.05.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB, et al
Friedrichstrasse 6
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2014/25]
Opponent(s)01  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Indas, S.A.U.
Camino Cerro de los Gamos n° 1
Edificio 3
Pta.3ª (Parque Empresarial Cerro de los Gamos)
28224 Pozuelo De Alarcon (Madrid) / ES
Opponent's representative
Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al
Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35
28014 Madrid / ES
 02  07.05.2014  12.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnatti, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Jump, Timothy John Simon
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 03  07.05.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Paul Hartmann AG
Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Friz, Oliver, et al
DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Gerokstraße 1
DE-70188 Stuttgart / DE
12.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1050/16
29.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
17.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
24.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
23.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
24.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
21.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.03.2005
AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
IE02.03.2014
LU02.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/27]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
MC07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
IE02.03.2014
LU02.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2016/25]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
BG07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
IE02.03.2014
LU02.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
IE02.03.2014
LU02.03.2014
CH31.03.2014
LI31.03.2014
Former [2015/07]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
IE02.03.2014
LU02.03.2014
Former [2014/48]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
LU02.03.2014
Former [2014/23]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
CZ07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
EE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
SK07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
RO07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
DK07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
CY07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY03.07.2013
AT07.08.2013
BE07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY03.07.2013
AT07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
SI07.08.2013
GR08.11.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY03.07.2013
AT07.08.2013
FI07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY03.07.2013
AT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
IS07.12.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT07.08.2013
LT07.08.2013
SE07.08.2013
PT09.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT07.08.2013
PT09.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]US2002177829  (FELL DAVID ARTHUR [US], et al);
 [X]US2003217803  (HERMANSSON KENT [SE], et al);
 [X]US2004210205  (VANGOMPEL PAUL [US], et al);
 [A]WO9611657  (KAO CORP [JP], et al)