Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1730110

EP1730110 - SULFUR COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS NS3 SERINE PROTEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Correction of patent specificationpublished on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schering Corporation
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, NJ 07033-0530 / US
[2010/23]
Former [2006/50]For all designated states
SCHERING CORPORATION
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033-0530 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENNETT, Frank
38 Keith Jeffries Avenue
Cranford, New Jersey 07016 / US
02 / LOVEY, Raymond G.
4692 NW 107th Avenue, Apt. 1402
Miami, Florida 33178 / US
03 / HUANG, Yuhua
132 Roger Avenue
Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US
04 / HENDRATA, Siska
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033-0530 / US
05 / SAKSENA, Anil, K.
53 Beverly Road
Upper Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US
06 / BOGEN, Stephane, L.
13 Dahlia Road
Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US
07 / LIU, Yi-Tsung
34 Alexandria Road
Morris Township, New Jersey 07960 / US
08 / NJOROGE, F., George
11 Softwood Way
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
09 / VENKATRAMAN, Srikanth
29 Jamaica Street
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
10 / CHEN, Kevin, X.
9 Gloria Avenue
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
11 / SANNIGRAHI, Mousumi
2 New Providence Avenue
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
12 / ARASAPPAN, Ashok
18 Larsen Court
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
13 / GIRIJAVALLABHAN, Viyyoor, M.
10 Maplewood Drive
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
14 / VELAZQUEZ, Francisco
4 Alexandra Way
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
15 / NAIR, Latha
560 Darwin Boulevard
Edison, NJ08820 / US
 [2010/18]
Former [2007/16]01 / BENNETT, Frank
38 Keith Jeffries Avenue
Cranford, New Jersey 07016 / US
02 / LOVEY, Raymond G.
4692 NW 107th Avenue, Apt. 1402
Miami, Florida 33178 / US
03 / HUANG, Yuhua
132 Roger Avenue
Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US
04 / HENDRATA, Siska
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033-0530 / US
05 / SAKSENA, Anil, K.
53 Beverly Road
Upper Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US
06 / BOGEN, Stephane, L.
13 Dahlia Road
Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US
07 / LIU, Yi-Tsung
34 Alexandria Road
Morris Township, New Jersey 07960 / US
08 / NJOROGE, F., George
11 Softwood Way
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
09 / VENKATRAMAN, Srikanth
35 Roanoke Street
Woodbridge, New Jersey 07095 / US
10 / CHEN, Kevin, X.
9 Gloria Avenue
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
11 / SANNIGRAHI, Mousumi
2 New Providence Avenue
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
12 / ARASAPPAN, Ashok
18 Larsen Court
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
13 / GIRIJAVALLABHAN, Viyyoor, M.
10 Maplewood Drive
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
14 / VELAZQUEZ, Francisco
4 Alexandra Way
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
15 / NAIR, Latha
560 Darwin Boulevard
Edison, NJ08820 / US
Former [2006/50]01 / BENNETT, Frank
38 Keith Jeffries Avenue
Cranford, New Jersey 07016 / US
02 / LOVEY, Raymond G.
4692 NW 107th Avenue, Apt. 1402
Miami, Florida 33178 / US
03 / HUANG, Yuhua
132 Roger Avenue
Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US
04 / HENDRATA, Siska
P.O. Box 116
Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US
05 / SAKSENA, Anil, K.
53 Beverly Road
Upper Montclair, New Jersey 07043 / US
06 / BOGEN, Stephane, L.
13 Dahlia Road
Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US
07 / LIU, Yi-Tsung
34 Alexandria Road
Morris Township, New Jersey 07960 / US
08 / NJOROGE, F., George
11 Softwood Way
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
09 / VENKATRAMAN, Srikanth
35 Roanoke Street
Woodbridge, New Jersey 07095 / US
10 / CHEN, Kevin, X.
9 Gloria Avenue
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
11 / SANNIGRAHI, Mousumi
2 New Providence Avenue
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
12 / ARASAPPAN, Ashok
18 Larsen Court
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
13 / GIRIJAVALLABHAN, Viyyoor, M.
10 Maplewood Drive
Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US
14 / VELAZQUEZ, Francisco
4 Alexandra Way
Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US
15 / NAIR, Latha
560 Darwin Boulevard
Edison, NJ08820 / US
Representative(s)Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/50]Adams, Harvey Vaughan John
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date05723607.724.02.2005
[2006/50]
WO2005US05795
Priority number, dateUS20040548670P27.02.2004         Original published format: US 548670 P
[2006/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005087731
Date:22.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1730110
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005
[2006/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1730110
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/23]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1730110
Date:02.11.2011
[2011/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:C07D209/52, C07D209/56, C07D491/04, C07K5/08, C07K5/02, A61K31/403, A61K31/407, A61P31/12
[2010/01]
Former International [2006/50]C07D209/52, C07D209/56, C07D491/04, C07K5/08, C07K7/02, A61K31/403, A61K31/407, A61P31/12, // C07D491/04, C07D307/00, C07D209/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/50]
Extension statesAL26.09.2006
BA26.09.2006
HR26.09.2006
LV26.09.2006
MK26.09.2006
YU26.09.2006
TitleGerman:SCHWEFELVERBINDUNGEN ALS INHIBITOREN DER NS3-SERINPROTEASE DES HEPATITIS-C-VIRUS[2006/50]
English:SULFUR COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS NS3 SERINE PROTEASE[2006/50]
French:COMPOSES SOUFRES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PROTEASE SERINE NS3 DU VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C[2006/50]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2006National basic fee paid 
26.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/50]
28.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2010Fee for grant paid
28.04.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.03.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]WO03062265  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * page 155, last formula; page 156, fifth formula; page 157, second and seventh formula; page 158, fourth formula; page 363, first formula; page 364, sixth formula; page 365, first formula; page * * 472, third and fourth formula; page 505, first formula; page 567, first formula;;; claim - *;
 [AD]WO0208244  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-49 * page 168, last formula; page 169, fifth formula; page 170, second and seventh formula; page 171, fourth formula;;; claim - *;
 [A]US2003216325  (SAKSENA ANIL K [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * page 296, examples 104, 106; page 405, third formula; page 406, first formula; page 408, first and second formula; page 506, first and second formula;;; claim - *;
 [A]WO0218369  (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [A] 1-49 * page 64, formula EG; page 66, formulae EQ and ER; page 67, formulae EW and EX;;; claim - *;
 [AD]WO0009543  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM CA LTD [CA], et al) [AD] 1-49 * page 122, compound 907;;; claim - *