Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1718350

EP1718350 - INTEGRATED DELIVERY DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DexCom, Inc.
5555 Oberlin Drive San Diego
California 92121 / US
[2006/45]
Inventor(s)01 / BRAUKER, James, H.
10831 Riesling Drive
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
02 / TAPSAK, Mark, A.
247 Asbury Road
Orangeville, PA 17859 / US
03 / SAINT, Sean, T.
13014 Texana Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
04 / KAMATH, Apurv, U.
143 S. Rios Avenue
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
05 / NEALE, Paul, V.
9179 Truman Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
06 / SIMPSON, Peter, C.
1236 Stratford Court
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
07 / MENSINGER, Michael, R., @162 12575 Ruette Alliante
San Diego
CA 92130 / US
08 / MARKOVIC, Dubravka, @7015 Charmant Drive 237 237
San Diego
CA 92122 / US
 [2013/18]
Former [2006/45]01 / BRAUKER, James, H.
10831 Riesling Drive
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
02 / TAPSAK, Mark, A.
247 Asbury Road
Orangeville, PA 17859 / US
03 / SAINT, Sean, T.
13014 Texana Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
04 / KAMATH, Apurv, U.
143 S. Rios Avenue
Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US
05 / NEALE, Paul, V.
9179 Truman Street
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
06 / SIMPSON, Peter, C.
1236 Stratford Court
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
07 / MENSINGER, Michael, R., 162 12575 Ruette Alliante
San Diego
CA 92130 / US
08 / MARKOVIC, Dubravka, 7015 Charmant Drive 237 237
San Diego
CA 92122 / US
Representative(s)Hill, Justin John , et al
Dentons UKMEA LLP
One Fleet Place
London EC4M 7WS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/24]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/18]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2006/45]Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
W.P. Thompson & Co, 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date05723951.924.02.2005
[2006/45]
WO2005US06301
Priority number, dateUS2004078935926.02.2004         Original published format: US 789359
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005082436
Date:09.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1718350
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005
[2006/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1718350
Date:01.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.09.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, A61M31/00
[2007/08]
Former International [2006/45]A61M1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERTE ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR KONTINUIERLICHEN GLUKOSESENSOR[2006/45]
English:INTEGRATED DELIVERY DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS GLUCOSE SENSOR[2006/45]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION INTEGRE POUR DETECTEUR DE GLUCOSE EN CONTINU[2006/45]
Entry into regional phase14.08.2006National basic fee paid 
14.08.2006Search fee paid 
14.08.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/45]
14.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.12.2012Fee for grant paid
19.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP10163654.6  / EP2226086
EP10163675.1  / EP2223710
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.11.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 02  31.01.2014  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/45]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  WITHDRAWN
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 02  31.01.2014  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Soeltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2015/39]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 02  31.01.2014  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins Schley, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Soeltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 02  31.01.2014  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins, Frank, et al
Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Söltlstraße 2a
81545 München / DE
Former [2015/16]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
 02  31.01.2014  07.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Peterreins, Frank, et al
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8
80807 München / DE
Former [2014/11]
Opponent(s)01  31.01.2014  05.02.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
1360 South Loop Road
Alameda, CA 94502 / US
Opponent's representative
Kazi, Ilya, et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
 02  31.01.2014   
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstr. 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Lohe, Hans-Jörg, et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Straße 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
13.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0669/16
10.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.02.2005
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
TR01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU24.02.2005
AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
IE24.02.2014
LU24.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
LU24.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
MC01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
LU24.02.2014
Former [2014/14]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
NL01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/11]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
IT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
RO01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/10]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
CZ01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
SK01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/09]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
DK01.05.2013
EE01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2014/06]AT01.05.2013
BE01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/52]AT01.05.2013
CY01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/50]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
PL01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
BG01.08.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/49]AT01.05.2013
FI01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
SE01.05.2013
SI01.05.2013
GR02.08.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/48]AT01.05.2013
LT01.05.2013
ES12.08.2013
IS01.09.2013
PT02.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT01.05.2013
PT02.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003187338  (SAY JAMES [US] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * claims 1,52,80,81,89,92 *;
 [A]US5971922  (ARITA SEIZABUROU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [XP]WO2005011489  (DEXCOM INC [US]; GOODE PAUL V JR [US]; BRAUKER JAMES H [US]; KAMATH AP) [XP] 1-18 * paragraph [0361] *;
 [E]WO2005057175  (DEXCOM INC [US]; BRAUKER JAMES H [US]; CARR-BRENDEL VICTORIA [US]; GOO) [E] 1-18 * page 61, line 30 - page 62, line 10; figures 34,35 *
International search[A]US6544212  (GALLEY PAUL J [US], et al)
by applicantUS2003187338