Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1722943 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1013
06.10.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
06.10.2017 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
29.09.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
20.09.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
19.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.09.2017 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 2
19.09.2017 French translation of claims Opposition 2
19.09.2017 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
14.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.08.2017 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
17.07.2017 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 17
17.07.2017 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 5
17.07.2017 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.07.2017 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
05.07.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.06.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.06.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 18
16.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.06.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.05.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
24.05.2017 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
03.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.04.2017 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
26.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.04.2017 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
25.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.04.2017 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
13.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
11.04.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
07.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Claims Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
07.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.04.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.03.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
30.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.09.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.09.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.09.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
19.09.2016 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
14.09.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
13.07.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
06.05.2016 Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents Appeal 1
22.04.2016 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 1
20.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.08.2015 Request for change of name -opponent Search / examination 11
07.07.2015 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 2
02.07.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
24.03.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 11
23.03.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.03.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.03.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
16.03.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
27.11.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.11.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.11.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
03.11.2014 Claims Appeal 1
03.11.2014 Claims Appeal 1
03.11.2014 Claims Appeal 1
03.11.2014 Claims Appeal 1
03.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.11.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
15.09.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
08.09.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
05.09.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
08.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.07.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 3
27.06.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 13
27.06.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
27.06.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.06.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
27.06.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 5
03.04.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 1
28.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 11
25.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.02.2014 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 4
20.02.2014 Data sheet for the decision Opposition 34
20.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
20.02.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
20.02.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
18.02.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
07.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 38
07.02.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
27.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.11.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
26.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
25.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.09.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
17.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
02.09.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.09.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.08.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.07.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
26.07.2013 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Opposition 1
19.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.07.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.07.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
17.07.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
17.07.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.07.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.06.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Opposition 1
06.06.2013 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
08.05.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
01.05.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
11.04.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.03.2012 General enquiry Opposition 1
25.01.2012 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
08.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
08.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Claims Opposition 1
08.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
08.12.2011 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 9
02.11.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
02.11.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.10.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
26.10.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.10.2011 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.07.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.07.2011 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
29.06.2011 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
29.06.2011 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
24.06.2011 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 2
26.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
25.05.2011 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.05.2011 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
25.05.2011 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
29.07.2010 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.07.2010 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.07.2010 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
07.07.2010 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.03.2010 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
18.03.2010 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.03.2010 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
18.03.2010 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
12.03.2010 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.03.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
09.02.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.02.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.12.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
17.12.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.12.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.12.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.02.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.02.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
10.09.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
10.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.09.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.09.2008 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 6
04.09.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
04.09.2008 Description Search / examination 3
04.09.2008 Drawings Search / examination 9
04.09.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.09.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.05.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.05.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.12.2006 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.11.2006 Request for change of representative Search / examination 4
25.10.2006 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
25.10.2006 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.10.2006 Refund order 20 % of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
20.09.2006 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
13.09.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
13.09.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.09.2006 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
02.08.2006 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2006 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.02.2006 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
08.02.2006 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2006 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.11.2005 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
17.11.2005 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.10.2005 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2005 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
18.10.2005 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
04.10.2005 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
29.09.2005 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 22
06.04.2005 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
06.04.2005 Claims International Searching Authority 4
06.04.2005 Description International Searching Authority 7
06.04.2005 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
06.04.2005 Drawings International Searching Authority 9