blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1722943


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.09.2017 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
15.09.2017 Change - representative
16.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.07.2017 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
23.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.05.2017 New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure
14.09.2016 Change: Date of oral proceedings
14.09.2016 Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.09.2015 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  07.10.2015  [2015/41]
07.07.2015 Change: Appeal number
19.06.2015 Change: Appeal number
05.11.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
10.09.2014 Change: Appeal number
08.09.2014 New entry: Appeal number
08.09.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
27.06.2014 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
27.06.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2014 Change - classification published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
11.04.2014 Change - classification published on  14.05.2014  [2014/20]
14.02.2014 Change - representative published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
06.11.2013 Change: Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
10.09.2013 Change: Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2013 Change: Date of oral proceedings
12.07.2013 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
01.06.2012 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
04.05.2012 Change - applicant published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
10.12.2011 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.2011 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
29.07.2011 Change - representative published on  31.08.2011  [2011/35]
08.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2011  [2011/32]
24.06.2011 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.06.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
03.06.2011 Opposition filed published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
06.05.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2011  [2011/23]
08.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
25.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.04.2011  [2011/17]
18.03.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.04.2011  [2011/16]
25.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.03.2011  [2011/13]
18.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2011  [2011/12]
11.02.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
21.01.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.02.2011  [2011/08]
23.07.2010 (Expected) grant published on  25.08.2010  [2010/34]
17.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.07.2010 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.03.2010 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
10.03.2010 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
19.02.2010 Change - German title published on  24.03.2010  [2010/12]
11.12.2009 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
09.10.2009 Change - divisional application(s) published on  11.11.2009  [2009/46]
13.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2009 Change - representative published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
05.09.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.05.2008 First examination report
26.04.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.05.2007 Change - extension states published on  20.06.2007  [2007/25]
01.12.2006 Change - representative published on  03.01.2007  [2007/01]
20.10.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2006  [2006/47]
20.10.2006 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2006  [2006/47]
11.10.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2006 PCT data prior to European publication
18.11.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
01.10.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.2005 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2005 PCT data prior to European publication