blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1722943 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP04743468 EP05724686 EP09172253



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2005090022Global Dossier 17.11.2005A3
WO2005090022 29.09.2005A2
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2005011930Global Dossier 10.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2008172878Global Dossier 24.07.2008A1
Priority number Date
US33775906 23.01.2006
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
US7764608 20.03.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2006196054Global Dossier 07.09.2006A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8567068Global Dossier 29.10.2013B2
US2012159787 28.06.2012A1
Priority number Date
US33775906 23.01.2006
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
US7764608 20.03.2008
US201213411909 05.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7810240Global Dossier 12.10.2010B2
US2009077809 26.03.2009A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US25095408 14.10.2008
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US7617607Global Dossier 17.11.2009B2
US2005039337 24.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20060037385Global Dossier 03.05.2006A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100935255BGlobal Dossier 06.01.2010B1
KR20080068141 22.07.2008A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100866661BGlobal Dossier 04.11.2008B1
KR20070015141 01.02.2007A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2007528268Global Dossier 11.10.2007A
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4708341BGlobal Dossier 22.06.2011B2
JP2006528015 14.12.2006A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2133182Global Dossier 24.08.2016B2
EP2133182 14.12.2011B1
EP2133182 06.01.2010A3
EP2133182 16.12.2009A2
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
EP05724686 03.03.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1646481Global Dossier 16.04.2008B1
EP1646481 19.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1722943Global Dossier 01.11.2017B2
EP1722943 25.08.2010B1
EP1722943 22.11.2006A2
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR048169 05.04.2006A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT392299T 15.05.2008T
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT478756T 15.09.2010T
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2004261452B 24.09.2009B2
AU2004261452 10.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2005222578B 01.05.2008B2
AU2005222578 29.09.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0412777 01.12.2015B1
BRPI0412777 26.09.2006A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0508652 14.08.2007A
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2532474 21.02.2012C
CA2532474 10.02.2005A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2557864 02.11.2010C
CA2557864 29.09.2005A1
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100421889C 01.10.2008C
CN1856390 01.11.2006A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN100404217C 23.07.2008C
CN1929971 14.03.2007A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202004021429U 28.02.2008U1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202005021798U 18.03.2010U1
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE602004013156T 31.07.2008T2
DE602004013156D 29.05.2008D1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE602005023131D 07.10.2010D1
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK1646481T 28.07.2008T3
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2305797T 01.11.2008T3
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
GB2406537 06.09.2006B
GB2406537 06.04.2005A
GB0317010D 27.08.2003D0
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL177677D 31.12.2006D0
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA06000732 30.03.2006A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL1722943T 30.05.2018T5
Priority number Date
WO2005US07184 03.03.2005
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
EP05724686 03.03.2005
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT1646481E 17.06.2008E
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2315687 27.01.2008C2
RU2006105193 27.08.2007A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2366568 10.09.2009C2
RU2006130657 20.04.2008A
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG151275 30.04.2009A1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI1646481T 31.08.2008T1
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
EP04743468 20.07.2004
WO2004GB03133 20.07.2004
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA200601226 30.05.2007B
Priority number Date
GB0317010 21.07.2003
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2011104392Global Dossier 02.06.2011A
Priority number Date
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT536968T 15.12.2011T
Priority number Date
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PL2133182T 29.09.2017T5
PL2133182T 31.05.2012T3
Priority number Date
US79886404 11.03.2004
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2133182