blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1722943

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 25.08.2010
 BELapse: 25.08.2010
 BGLapse: 25.11.2010
 CHLapse: 31.03.2011
CYLapse: 25.08.2010
 CZLapse: 25.08.2010
 DE 
 DKLapse: 25.08.2010
 EELapse: 25.08.2010
 ESLapse: 06.12.2010
 FILapse: 25.08.2010
 FRLapse: 31.03.2011
 GB 
 GR 
 HULapse: 25.08.2010
 IELapse: 03.03.2011
 ISLapse: 25.12.2010
 ITLapse: 25.08.2010
 LILapse: 31.03.2011
 LTLapse: 25.08.2010
 LULapse: 03.03.2011
 MCLapse: 31.03.2011
 NLLapse: 25.08.2010
 PL 
 PTLapse: 27.12.2010
 ROLapse: 25.08.2010
 SELapse: 25.08.2010
 SILapse: 25.08.2010
 SKLapse: 25.08.2010
 TRLapse: 25.08.2010
Examination procedure07.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase13.09.2006National basic fee paid 
13.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted25.08.2010
Opposition procedure19.09.2017Fee for printing new specification paid 
Appeal following opposition05.09.2014APPEAL FILED
03.11.2014APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
18.05.2017APPEAL RESULT
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:22.11.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20060913
 
Event date:22.11.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:20.06.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:04.06.2008 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20080502
 
Event date:25.08.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:25.08.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.09.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:07.10.2010 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:602005023131
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20101007
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:15.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL VDEP
Code Expl.:-INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:21.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20100402644 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:25.01.2011 
Event description:LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.01.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:31.01.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.01.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.01.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20101125
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20101225
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20101227
 
Event date:28.02.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:29.04.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.05.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:30.06.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20101206
 
Event date:06.07.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Effective DATE:20110525
 
Event date:25.08.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602005023131 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
Effective DATE:20110525
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:23.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20111130
 
Event date:04.01.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110331
 
Event date:31.01.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110303
 
Event date:06.06.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:THE GILLETTE COMPANY
 
Event date:04.07.2012 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC.
Effective DATE:20110525
 
Event date:31.05.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20110303
 
Event date:30.09.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20100825
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B26B 21/22 20060101ALI20140407BHEP
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B26B 21/42 20060101ALI20140407BHEP
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B29D 30/46 20060101ALI20140407BHEP
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B23D 35/00 20060101AFI20140407BHEP
 
Event date:14.05.2014 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED AFTER GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B26B 21/40 20060101ALI20140407BHEP
 
Event date:07.10.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE BRANDS, LLC
Effective DATE:20110525
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170223
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20171101
 
Event date:01.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 602005023131 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
 
Event date:01.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20180400090 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20180518
 
Event date:31.08.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20180301
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Event date:21.11.2018 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20180303
 
Event date:28.02.2019 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180303
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190219
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.05.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20190213
Year of Fee Payment:15