Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1722943

EP1722943 - SHAVING RAZORS AND OTHER HAIR CUTTING ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company
One Gillette Park- 3E
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2017/44]
Former [2012/23]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
One Gillette Park- 3E
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Former [2006/47]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, MA 02199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PENNELL, Evan
86 Leavitt Street
Hingham, MA 02043 / US
02 / LEE, Alejandro
366 Putnam Avenue, Apartment 3
Cambridge, MA 02130 / US
03 / WALKER, Vincent
20 Twinbrook Drive
Bridgewater, MA 02324 / US
04 / TROTTA, Robert
312 West Elm Street
Pembroke, MA 02359 / US
05 / POWELL, Kevin
8 Farrier's Close, Bramley Tadley
Hampshire RG26 5AX / GB
06 / YUSKOWSKI, John
31 Hickory Lane
Boxford, MA 01921 / US
 [2006/47]
Representative(s)Kohol, Sonia
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2017/44]
Former [2014/12]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2011/35]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/12]Chandrani, Vandita , et al
Procter & Gamble Patent Department Technical Centres Limited Rusham Park Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2007/01]Clarkson, Paul Magnus , et al
Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st floor, Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Former [2006/47]Rasser, Jacobus Cornelis , et al
Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1
1096 HA Amsterdam / NL
Application number, filing date05724686.003.03.2005
[2006/47]
WO2005US07184
Priority number, dateUS2004079886411.03.2004         Original published format: US 798864
[2006/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005090022
Date:29.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1722943
Date:22.11.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005
[2006/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1722943
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/34]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1722943
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:B23D35/00, B29D30/46, B26B21/22, B26B21/40, B26B21/42
[2014/20]
Former International [2006/47]B26B21/40, B26B21/42
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/44]
Former [2006/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:NASSRASIERER UND ANDERE HAARSCHNEIDEANORDNUNGEN[2010/12]
English:SHAVING RAZORS AND OTHER HAIR CUTTING ASSEMBLIES[2006/47]
French:RASOIRS ET AUTRES ENSEMBLES DE COUPE[2006/47]
Former [2006/47]NASSRASIERER UND ANDERE HARRSCHNEIDEANORDNUNGEN
Entry into regional phase13.09.2006National basic fee paid 
13.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.2005Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/47]
02.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2010Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.05.2010
18.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2010Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
07.07.2010Fee for grant paid
07.07.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09172253.8  / EP2133182
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  06.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
1350 Timberlake Manor Parkway
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
Opponent's representative
dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  06.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
1350 Timberlake Manor Parkway
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
Opponent's representative
Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2012/27]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011  06.06.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Eveready Battery Company, Inc.
533 Maryville University Drive
St Louis, Missouri 63141 / US
Opponent's representative
von Kreisler Selting Werner, et al
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2011/27]
Opponent(s)01  25.05.2011   
Eveready Battery Company, Inc.
533 Maryville University Drive
St Louis, Missouri 63141 / US
Opponent's representative
Hilleringmann, Jochen, et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
29.06.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.12.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.04.2014Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.06.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
19.09.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition05.09.2014Appeal received No.  T1840/14
03.11.2014Statement of grounds filed
18.05.2017Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
HU25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE03.03.2011
LU03.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
FR31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
TR25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
IE03.03.2011
LU03.03.2011
CH31.03.2011
FR31.03.2011
LI31.03.2011
MC31.03.2011
Former [2011/29]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
IT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
RO25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
ES06.12.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/23]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
CZ25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
EE25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
SK25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/19]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
DK25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/16]AT25.08.2010
BE25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
NL25.08.2010
SE25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/13]AT25.08.2010
CY25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
IS25.12.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/11]AT25.08.2010
FI25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
SI25.08.2010
BG25.11.2010
PT27.12.2010
Former [2011/08]AT25.08.2010
LT25.08.2010
Cited inInternational search[ADX]US6276061  (ROZENKRANC MENACHEM) [AD] 1,2 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 33; figures 1-4 * [X] 3,28-31;
 [A]US2003217469  (COFFIN DAVID) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US6173498  (WARRICK PAUL LESLIE ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5386750  (MORRISON ET AL) [A] 2 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 68; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]DE3733486  (BLUME,WILHELM) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US2001003869  (ROCHA MANUAL ANTONIO) [A] * abstract *;
 [X]GB1456141  (GILLETTE CO) [X] 4,21,22,26 * page 1, line 12 - page 2, line 66; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]GB1587317  (GILLETTE CO) [A] 4 * page 1, line 70 - line 78 * * page 2, line 31 - line 52; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US6009624  (APPRILLE, JR. ET AL) [A] * the whole document * * column 4, line 33 - line 46 *
by applicantUS5787586
 US6276061
OppositionUS5787586
 GB667558
 WO2005011930
 US1272816
 US2505493
 US3675323
 US4901437
 WO2005090022
 US686148
 WO9801053
 US5359774
 EP2133182
 EP1646481
    - Notice of opposition to EP-B-2133182 by Feintechnik GmbH Eisfeld, 07.09.2012
    - Communication of OD 18.12.2013
    - Datasheet for the decision T 1598/10