Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1732434

EP1732434 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ASSESSING RETINAL DAMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Research Foundation of the State University of New York
35 State Street
Albany, NY 12207 / US
[2006/51]
Inventor(s)01 / WYATT, Harry, J.
148 West 23rd St., 11G
New York, NY 10011 / US
 [2006/51]
Representative(s)Naylor, Matthew John
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/51]Naylor, Matthew John
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date05725293.409.03.2005
[2006/51]
WO2005US08041
Priority number, dateUS20040551649P09.03.2004         Original published format: US 551649 P
US2004097261325.10.2004         Original published format: US 972613
[2006/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2005086929
Date:22.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1732434
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2005
[2006/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.08.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/14
[2007/37]
Former International [2006/51]A61B3/00, A61B3/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON RETINASCHÄDEN[2006/51]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ASSESSING RETINAL DAMAGE[2006/51]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR L'EVALUATION DE DOMMAGE RETINIEN[2006/51]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2006National basic fee paid 
28.09.2006Search fee paid 
28.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.09.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
29.05.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201410   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]  KARDON ET AL., AUTOMATED PUPIL PERIMETRY- PUPIL FIELD MAPPING IN PATIENTS AND NORMAL SUBJECTS, OPHTHALMOLOGY, VOL. 98, NR. 4, XP008099626 [X] 1,2,32,43,44 * page 485 - page 487 * [Y] 3-31,33-42,45

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-6420(91)32267-X
 [Y]  ZALTA, "LIMITATIONS OF THE GLAUCOMA HEMIFIELD TEST IN IDENTIFYING EARLY GLAUCOMATOUS FILED LOSS", ANN OPHTHALMOL, (2000), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 33 - 45, XP002508555 [Y] 3-31,33-42,45 * page 33 - page 35 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12009-000-0010-9
 [PX]  WYATT H J ET AL, "A new pupil-based approach to glaucoma testing: Design and initial testing", IOVS, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION-FOR-RESEARCH-IN-VISION-AND-OPHTHALM OLOGY; FT LAUDERDALE, FL, USA; APRIL 24 -29, 2004, (200404), vol. 45, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0146-0404, page U149, XP002508556 [PX] 1-45 * the whole document *
 [PA]  CHEN Y ET AL, "A new pupil-based approach to glaucoma testing: Application of the method to glaucoma patients", IOVS, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION-FOR-RESEARCH-IN-VISION-AND-OPHTHALM OLOGY; FT LAUDERDALE, FL, USA; APRIL 24 -29, 2004, (200404), vol. 45, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0146-0404, page U148, XP002508557 [PA] 1-45 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6116736  (STARK LAWRENCE W [US], et al)