Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1734975

EP1734975 - HERBAL THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF FOOD ALLERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Herbs Spring, LLC
409 West Lyons Farm Drive
Greenwich, CT 06831 / US
[2015/24]
Former [2012/32]For all designated states
Herbs Spring, LLC
409 West Lyons Farm Drive
Greenwich, CT 06831 / US
Former [2006/52]For all designated states
Li, Xiu-MIn
1430 Raleigh Road
Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US
For all designated states
Sampson, Hugh A.
19 Carleon Avenue
Larchmont, NY 10538 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Xiu-Min
1430 Raleigh Road
Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US
02 / SAMPSON, Hugh A.
409 West Lyons Farm Road
Greenwich, CT 06831 / US
 [2013/46]
Former [2012/37]01 / LI, Xiu-Min
1430 Raleigh Road
Mamaroneck, NY 10543 / US
02 / SAMPSON, Hugh A.
19 Carleon Ave.
Larchmont, NY 10538 / US
Former [2006/52]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Sharples, Andrew John , et al
EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2013/47]
Former [2013/09]Sharples, Andrew John
EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
Former [2006/52]Harris, Jennifer Lucy
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
GB-London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date05725522.614.03.2005
[2006/52]
WO2005US08417
Priority number, dateUS20040554775P19.03.2004         Original published format: US 554775 P
[2006/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005092360
Date:06.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1734975
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005
[2006/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1734975
Date:10.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/185, A61K36/232, A61K36/074, A61K36/736, A61K36/258, A61K36/9068, A61K36/54, A61K36/756, A61K36/758, A61K36/718, A61P37/08
[2010/15]
Former International [2006/52]A61K35/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2006/52]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:PFLANZLICHE THERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NAHRUNGSMITTELALLERGIEN[2006/52]
English:HERBAL THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF FOOD ALLERGY[2006/52]
French:THERAPIE A BASE DE PLANTES MEDICINALES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ALLERGIE ALIMENTAIRE[2006/52]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2006National basic fee paid 
13.10.2006Search fee paid 
13.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/52]
22.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2015Fee for grant paid
30.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12178807.9  / EP2545931
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2010
Opposition(s)11.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.10.2013Request for further processing filed
04.10.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.10.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2005
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
TR10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
[2018/33]
Former [2018/28]HU14.03.2005
AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/40]AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
NL10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT10.06.2015
BE10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/49]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/21]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
IT10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
DK10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
GR11.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0166122  (SINAI SCHOOL MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 8 - line 13 * * page 21, line 17 - page 25, line 3; example 4; claim 2 *;
 [X]  LI X -M ET AL, "Food Allergy Herbal Formula-1 (FAHF-1) blocks peanut-induced anaphylaxis in a murine model", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY 2001 US, (2001), vol. 108, no. 4, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 639 - 646, XP002570591 [X] 1,3-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mai.2001.118787
 [XP]  SRIVASTAVA K D ET AL, "The Chinese herbal medicine formula FAHF-2 completely blocks anaphylactic reactions in a murine model of peanut allergy", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, (20050101), vol. 115, no. 1, ISSN 0091-6749, pages 171 - 178, XP004701636 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2004.10.003
 [A]  SRIVASTAVA K D ET AL, "A Chinese herbal medicine formula, FAHF-2, completely blocks anaphylaxis in a murine model of peanut allergy.", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, & 60TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF ALLERGY, ASTHMA AND IMMUNOLOGY (AAAAI); SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; MARCH 19-23, 2004, (200402), vol. 113, no. 2 Supplement, ISSN 0091-6749, page S337, XP002570592 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2004.01.720
 [A]  LI X -M ET AL, "Novel approaches for the treatment of food allergy", CURRENT OPINION IN ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY 2002 US, (2002), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1528-4050, pages 273 - 278, XP008119657 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [T]  KATTAN J D ET AL, "Pharmacological and immunological effects of individual herbs in the Food Allergy Herbal Formula-2 (FAHF-2) on peanut allergy", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH 200805 GB, (200805), vol. 22, no. 5, ISSN 0951-418X 1099-1573, pages 651 - 659, XP002570594 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.2357
 [T]  SRIVASTAVA K D ET AL, "The Traditional Chinese Medicine Formula FAHF-2 Provides Complete Protection from Anaphylaxis in a Murine Model of Multiple Food Allergy", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, & 65TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-ALLERGY-ASTHMA-AND-IMM UNOLOGY; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; MARCH 13 -17, 2009, (200902), vol. 123, no. 2, Suppl. S, ISSN 0091-6749, page S151, XP002570595 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2008.12.565
 [T]  SRIVASTAVA K D ET AL, "Silencing peanut allergy: A Chinese herbal formula, Fahf-2, completely blocks peanut-induced anaphylaxis for up to 6 months following therapy in a murine model of peanut allergy", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, & 62ND ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-ALLERGY-ASTHMA-AND-IMM UNOLOGY; MIAMI BEACH, FL, USA; MARCH 03 -07, 2006, (200602), vol. 117, no. 2, Suppl. S, ISSN 0091-6749, page S328, XP002570596 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2005.12.1292
 [T]  WANG J ET AL, "Investigation of the Safety of the Food Allergy Herbal Formula (FAHF-2) in Patients with Food Allergy-Phase 1", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, vol. 123, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, (20090201), page S176, (20090201), XP025908161 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2008.12.664
 [T]  CHEN Y ET AL, "Study and development of Food Allergy Herbal Formula (FAHF-2)", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ACADEMY-OF-ALLERGY-ASTHMA-AND-IMMUNOL OGY; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; FEBRUARY 23 -27, 2007, (200701), vol. 119, no. 1, Suppl. 1, ISSN 0091-6749, page S113, XP002570597 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2006.11.425
 [T]  KO J ET AL, "Effect of Chinese herbal formulas on T cell responses in patients with peanut allergy or asthma", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, MOSBY, INC, US, (20050201), vol. 115, no. 2, ISSN 0091-6749, page S34, XP004845299 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2004.12.155
International search[Y]US6630176  (LI XIU-MIN [US], et al)
Examination   KATTAN J D ET AL, "Pharmacological and immunological effects of individual herbs in the Food Allergy Herbal Formula-2 (FAHF-2) on peanut allergy", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD. CHICHESTER, GB, vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1002/PTR.2357, ISSN 0951-418X, (20080501), pages 651 - 659, (20080403), XP002570594

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.2357
    Bensky D., Barolet R., Chinese Herbal Medicine: Formulas & Strategies, Seattle, Eastland Press, page 33-34, 466-467,
    CARDOSO CRISTINA R ET AL, "IL-4 regulates susceptibility to intestinal inflammation in murine food allergy", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV200900220664,
    SUN JIE ET AL, "Suppression of early IL-4 production underlies the failure of CD4 T cells activated by TLR-stimulated dendritic cells to differentiate into Th2 cells", DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, Database accession no. PREV200700361363,