Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1732436

EP1732436 - DETECTING SLEEP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[2010/16]
Former [2008/41]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
MS LC340, 710 Medtronic Parkway NE
Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MIESEL, Keith, A.
896 Ashland Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55104 / US
02 / HERUTH, Kenneth, T.
4904 Bruce Avenue
Edina, MN 55424 / US
 [2006/51]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/51]Hughes, Andrea Michelle , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date05725806.316.03.2005
[2006/51]
WO2005US08881
Priority number, dateUS20040553771P16.03.2004         Original published format: US 553771 P
US2004082596415.04.2004         Original published format: US 825964
[2006/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2005089641
Date:29.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1732436
Date:20.12.2006
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2005
[2006/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1732436
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.09.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0205, A61N1/05, A61N1/365, G06F17/00, G08B21/06
[2006/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/51]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NACHWEIS VON SCHLAF[2006/51]
English:DETECTING SLEEP[2006/51]
French:DETECTION DU SOMMEIL[2006/51]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2006National basic fee paid 
16.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2006Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.10.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
16.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2009Date of oral proceedings
21.09.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2010Fee for grant paid
02.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
10.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
06.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
HU21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
TR21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
BG21.07.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
TR21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
BG21.07.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2013/42]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
BG21.07.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/16]AT21.04.2010
BE21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
IT21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/11]AT21.04.2010
CZ21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
RO21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
SK21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/09]AT21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
EE21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
PT23.08.2010
Former [2011/07]AT21.04.2010
DK21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
Former [2011/03]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
PL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
CY05.05.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
Former [2011/01]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
GR22.07.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
Former [2010/52]AT21.04.2010
FI21.04.2010
LT21.04.2010
NL21.04.2010
SE21.04.2010
SI21.04.2010
ES01.08.2010
IS21.08.2010
Former [2010/46]NL21.04.2010
ES01.08.2010
Former [2010/45]NL21.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5732696  (RAPOPORT ET AL) [X] 1,3-9,21-24 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 3; claim 1 * * column 5, lines 5-19 * * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 30 * * column 7, lines 36-56 * * column 8, lines 44-46 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 4 * [I] 10-13,15,25,27;
 [XI]US2002193839  (CHO YONG KYUN ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-7,16-18,21-24 * paragraphs [0051] - [0061] - [0072] , [0096] , [0102] * [I] 19;
 [X]US2003163059  (POEZEVERA YANN ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-7,16,17,21-24 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0015] - [0018] - [0028] , [0030] *;
 [A]US2002193697  (CHO YONG KYUN ET AL) [A] 2,3,14,16,20,26 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0028] , [0035] , [0036] , [0039] - [0041] - [0053] , [0055]; figures 5,6 *;
 [X]US2003153953  (PARK EULJOON ET AL) [X] 1,16,20 * paragraphs [0050] - [0055] - [0061]; figure 2 *;
 [I]WO02100267  (COMPUMEDICS LIMITED; BURTON, DAVID; ZILBERG, EUGENE) [I] 1,2,6-10,14,21-26 * page 92, line 32 - page 94, line 16; figure 4 * * page 100, line 26 - page 101, line 21 * * page 52, lines 1,2; figure 48 *;
 [PX]EP1437159  (PACESETTER, INC) [PX] 1-10,12,14,16,21-26 * paragraphs [0031] , [0047] - [0054] - [0060] , [0062]; figure 10 *