blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1748695

EP1748695 - VENDABLE SANDWICH AND FOOD PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.03.2017  [2017/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Candwich Food Corporation
10044 Stone Mountain Cove
Sandy, UT 84092 / US
[2007/06]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRKLAND, Mark, R.
10044 Stone Mountain Cove
Sandy, UT 84092 / US
 [2007/06]
Representative(s)Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/06]Vleck, Jan Montagu
Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date05726062.222.03.2005
[2007/06]
WO2005US09604
Priority number, dateUS2004080625222.03.2004         Original published format: US 806252
[2007/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2005092063
Date:06.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1748695
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.12.2006
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:A21D10/02
[2007/06]
CPC:
B65D85/36 (EP,US); A23P20/25 (EP,US); B65D17/4011 (EP,US);
B65D17/402 (EP,US); B65D21/0227 (EP,US); B65D51/28 (EP,US);
B65D77/02 (EP,US); B65D77/08 (EP,US); B65D81/3205 (EP,US);
B65D81/34 (EP,US); B65D85/72 (EP,US); A23V2002/00 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/06]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERKAUFBARES SANDWICH UND LEBENSMITTEL[2007/06]
English:VENDABLE SANDWICH AND FOOD PRODUCTS[2007/06]
French:PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES ET SANDWICHS[2015/51]
Former [2007/06]PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES ET SANDWICHS POUR DISTRIBUTEURS AUTOMATIQUES
Entry into regional phase23.10.2006National basic fee paid 
23.10.2006Search fee paid 
23.10.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
23.10.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/06]
22.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/11]
03.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/11]
15.12.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2017
12.01.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.10.2015Request for further processing filed
20.10.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.10.2015Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
15.08.2013Request for further processing filed
15.08.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.09.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
21.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201309   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2013
31.03.201410   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2014
31.03.201511   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2015
31.03.201612   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5664671  (NEDBLAKE JR GREYDON WESLEY [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9-11,13,14,16-24 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, lines 41-57 * [Y] 1,18;
 [XY]US2001035417  (KANTOR DEBORAH EVE [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11,13-24 * figures 1-3,6 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0023] * [Y] 1,18;
 [XY]US2003201270  (FAHEY LONNIE J [US]) [X] 10,11,13,15,17,20,22-25 * figures 2,6,7 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0028] , [0030] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0076] *[Y] 1,18
International search[Y]US1514379  ;
 [Y]US4607756  (COURTMAN MURRAY G [NZ]);
 [Y]US4730750  (FICKEN LEONARD A [US]);
 [X]US5277920  (WEAVER JR EDMUND A [US]);
 [Y]US5279841  (YU CHINE-MIN [US]);
 [X]US5567455  (ALSBROOK SR WILLIAM N [US]);
 [Y]US6068865  (LEE THOMAS D [US], et al)
ExaminationUS4721622
 WO9605578
    - Edmund Powers, "Effect of water activity on the microbiological stability of mobility-enhancing ration components", Technical Report Natick/TR-00/003, Natick, Massachusetts, USA, (19991001), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.dtic.mil/dtic/tr/fulltext/u2/a370412.pdf, (20140211), XP055101446
    - "Bread Rolls in Cans", GNPD database - Record ID 220632, (20030801), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/220632/from_search/RBRsP6Gz7c/, (20151127), XP055231869
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.