blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1757512

EP1757512 - STEERING DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 542-8502 / JP
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / TOSHIMA, Akihiro c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 5428502 / JP
02 / TANAKA, Ryo c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 5428502 / JP
03 / TAKAKI, Kazuhiko c/o JTEKT Corporation
5-8, Minamisemba 3-Chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 5428502 / JP
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/29]Selting, Günther
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2007/09]Selting, Günther
Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date05727852.529.03.2005
[2007/09]
WO2005JP05944
Priority number, dateJP2004011035202.04.2004         Original published format: JP 2004110352
[2007/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2005095179
Date:13.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1757512
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2007/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.10.2005
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2007
ClassificationIPC:B62D5/10, B62D5/22, B62D3/12
[2007/09]
CPC:
B62D5/22 (EP,US); Y10T29/49934 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/28]
Former [2007/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LENKVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2007/09]
English:STEERING DEVICE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2007/09]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DIRECTION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI[2007/09]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2006Translation filed 
26.09.2006National basic fee paid 
26.09.2006Search fee paid 
26.09.2006Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2006Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2006Examination requested  [2007/09]
07.09.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/12]
08.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DXY]JPH037070U  (KK) [DX] 1,3 * figure 6 * [Y] 2,4;
 [Y]WO9813236  (BUDD CO [US]) [Y] 2,4* abstract *
International search[A]JPS5598678U  ;
 [A]JPS5568474  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN);
 [A]JP2002002513  (KOYO SEIKO CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.